Matamata Marine Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429040081137) was launched on 13 Jun 1973. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 20 Arawa Street, Matamata (type: registered, physical). Candy Gillespie, 20 Arawa Street, Matamata had been their registered address, up until 06 Dec 1996. 10000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 5000 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Watkinson, Kenneth James (an individual) located at Matamata, Matamata postcode 3400. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (5000 shares); it includes
Watkinson, Sharron Lee (an individual) - located at Matamata, Matamata. Our information was last updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 Arawa Street, Matamata, 3400 | Service & physical | 18 Feb 1992 |
20 Arawa Street, Matamata | Registered | 06 Dec 1996 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kenneth James Watkinson
Matamata, 3400
Address used since 08 Sep 2015 |
Director | 10 Jul 1995 - current |
Sharron Lee Watkinson
Matamata, 3400
Address used since 08 Sep 2015 |
Director | 10 Jul 1995 - current |
Geoffrey Lloyd Petersen
Matamata,
Address used since 26 Nov 1979 |
Director | 26 Nov 1979 - 15 Jul 1996 |
Mary Veronica Petersen
Matamata,
Address used since 01 Oct 1993 |
Director | 01 Oct 1993 - 15 Jul 1996 |
Walter Thomas Peterson
Matamata,
Address used since 26 Nov 1979 |
Director | 26 Nov 1979 - 01 Oct 1993 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Candy Gillespie, 20 Arawa Street, Matamata | Registered | 06 Dec 1996 - 06 Dec 1996 |
Candy Diprose & Partners, Arawa St, Matamata | Registered | 05 Dec 1996 - 06 Dec 1996 |
- | Physical | 18 Feb 1992 - 18 Feb 1992 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Watkinson, Kenneth James Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
13 Jun 1973 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Watkinson, Sharron Lee Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
13 Jun 1973 - current |
Candy Gillespie Limited Candy Gillespie |
|
Empire Stone Limited Candy Gillespie |
|
L & M Ventures 2005 Limited Candy Gillespie |
|
White Swan Properties Limited Candy Gillespie |
|
Bay Big Bales Limited Candy Gillespie |
|
Bw Van Heuven Limited Candy Gillespie |