Dawson & Havard Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429040095158) was launched on 16 Aug 1971. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 122 Queen Street, Masterton, 5810 (type: registered, service). 40 Perry Street, Masterton, Masterton had been their registered address, up until 21 Oct 2021. 190000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 190000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
G & D Logging Limited (an entity) located at Masterton postcode 5810. Businesscheck's information was updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
316-322 Queen Street, Masterton, 5810 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Oct 2021 |
122 Queen Street, Masterton, 5810 | Registered & service | 25 Jan 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gavin Bruce Wilson
Rd 11, Masterton, 5810
Address used since 02 Feb 2021 |
Director | 02 Feb 2021 - current |
Anthony Michael Ross Havard
Whitianga, 3510
Address used since 23 Feb 2015 |
Director | 20 Oct 1983 - 02 Feb 2021 |
Alvis Yvonne Marjorie Havard
Masterton, 5810
Address used since 01 Oct 2014 |
Director | 20 Oct 1983 - 02 Feb 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
40 Perry Street, Masterton, Masterton, 5810 | Registered & physical | 08 Mar 2021 - 21 Oct 2021 |
109 Tuwharetoa Street, Taupo, 3330 | Physical & registered | 12 Mar 2013 - 08 Mar 2021 |
74 Kaimanawa Street, Taupo, 3330 | Registered & physical | 29 Nov 2010 - 12 Mar 2013 |
The Blackburne Group Limited, 100 Horomatangi Street, Taupo 3330 | Registered & physical | 21 Jan 2010 - 29 Nov 2010 |
The Blackburne Group Ltd, 14 Ruapehu Street, Taupo 3330 | Registered & physical | 11 Feb 2009 - 21 Jan 2010 |
14 Ruapehu Street, Taupo | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 11 Feb 2009 |
30 Heu Heu Street, Taupo | Registered | 20 Jul 1995 - 11 Feb 2009 |
129 Kolmar Road,, Papatoetoe. | Registered | 05 Jun 1991 - 20 Jul 1995 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
G & D Logging Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046565396 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Masterton 5810 |
02 Feb 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Havard, Alvis Yvonne Marjorie Individual |
Masterton 5810 |
16 Aug 1971 - 02 Feb 2021 |
Havard, Anthony Michael Ross Individual |
Whitianga 3510 |
16 Aug 1971 - 02 Feb 2021 |
Flysafe Limited 109 Tuwharetoa Street |
|
Burca Limited 109 Tuwharetoa Street |
|
Ecureuil Investments Limited 109 Tuwharetoa Street |
|
Taupo Digger Hire Limited 109 Tuwharetoa Street |
|
Tailwagger Tourism Limited 109 Tuwharetoa Street |
|
Mclaren Pastoral Limited 109 Tuwharetoa Street |