Brochendale Farm Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429040110721) was incorporated on 31 Oct 1967. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 11 Tuhoro St, Otorohanga (type: registered, physical). Osborne Garnett & Doole, Tuhoro Street, Otorohanga had been their physical address, until 30 Jan 2005. 2000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 500 shares (25 per cent of shares), namely:
Cowan, Donald Arthur (an individual) located at Rewarewa, Otorohanga. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20 per cent of all shares (exactly 400 shares); it includes
Cowan, Evan John (an individual) - located at Rewarewa, Otorohanga. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (1000 shares, 50%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Davison, Rosemary Kathleen, located at Rd 5, Otorohanga (a director). Businesscheck's information was updated on 22 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
11 Tuhoro St, Otorohanga | Registered | 30 Jan 2005 |
11 Tuhoro Street, Otorohanga | Physical & service | 30 Jan 2005 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Anne Patricia Betschart
Rd 5, Te Awamutu, 3875
Address used since 23 Feb 2015 |
Director | 23 Feb 2015 - current |
Rosemary Kathleen Davison
Rd 5, Otorohanga, 3975
Address used since 26 Mar 2015 |
Director | 26 Mar 2015 - current |
Arthur Blair Cowan
Rewarewa, Otorohanga,
Address used since 07 Mar 1988 |
Director | 07 Mar 1988 - 26 Feb 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Osborne Garnett & Doole, Tuhoro Street, Otorohanga | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 30 Jan 2005 |
C/o M/s Phillips & Powell, 27 Maniapoto St, Otorohanga | Registered | 10 Jan 1996 - 30 Jan 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cowan, Donald Arthur Individual |
Rewarewa Otorohanga |
31 Oct 1967 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cowan, Evan John Individual |
Rewarewa Otorohanga |
31 Oct 1967 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Davison, Rosemary Kathleen Director |
Rd 5 Otorohanga 3975 |
19 Feb 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Betschart, Anne Patricia Individual |
Rd 5 Te Awamutu 3875 |
31 Oct 1967 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Davidson, Rosemary Kathleen Individual |
Rd 5 Otorohanga 3975 |
31 Oct 1967 - 19 Feb 2016 |
Cowan, Arthur Blair Individual |
Rewarewa Otorohanga |
31 Oct 1967 - 01 Apr 2015 |
Shalimar Trustee Company Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |
|
Rangitoto Lands Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |
|
Les Young Trustee Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |
|
Cumpstone Independent Trustee Company Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |
|
North Pine Dairy Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |
|
A & L Bricklaying Limited 11 Tuhoro Street |