Rosser Holdings Limited (NZBN 9429040186696) was started on 11 Oct 1974. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 29 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 (type: registered, physical). Milnes Beatson Limited, Chartered Accountants, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka had been their physical address, until 27 Mar 2012. 65000 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 32499 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Rosser, Robert John (an individual) located at Uruwhenua, R D 1 Takaka postcode 7183,
Milnes Beatson Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at Motueka postcode 7120. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25% of all shares (exactly 16250 shares); it includes
Rosser, Shirley Anne (an individual) - located at R D 1 Takaka. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allotment (16250 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Rosser, Roger Lyoid, located at R D 1 Takaka (a director). The Businesscheck data was updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
29 Wallace Street, Motueka, 7120 | Registered & physical & service | 27 Mar 2012 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shirley Anne Rosser
R D 1 Takaka, 7183
Address used since 19 Mar 2012 |
Director | 11 Dec 1987 - current |
Roger Lyoid Rosser
R D 1 Takaka, 7183
Address used since 19 Mar 2012 |
Director | 11 Dec 1987 - current |
Roger Lloyd Rosser
R D 1 Takaka, 7183
Address used since 19 Mar 2012 |
Director | 11 Dec 1987 - current |
Robert John Rosser
Rd 1, Takaka, 7183
Address used since 31 Mar 2022 |
Director | 31 Mar 2022 - current |
Cindy Marie Rosser
Rd 1, Takaka, 7183
Address used since 31 Mar 2022 |
Director | 31 Mar 2022 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Milnes Beatson Limited, Chartered Accountants, 29 Wallace Street, Motueka | Physical & registered | 12 Mar 2007 - 27 Mar 2012 |
29 Wallace Street, Motueka | Physical | 01 Jul 1997 - 12 Mar 2007 |
C/o Milnes And Lockhart, 155 High Street, Motueka | Registered | 17 Mar 1997 - 12 Mar 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rosser, Robert John Individual |
Uruwhenua R D 1 Takaka 7183 |
01 Apr 2010 - current |
Milnes Beatson Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429035113409 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Motueka 7120 |
01 Apr 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rosser, Shirley Anne Individual |
R D 1 Takaka 7183 |
11 Oct 1974 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rosser, Roger Lyoid Director |
R D 1 Takaka 7183 |
12 Dec 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rosser, Robert John Individual |
Uruwhenua R D 1 Takaka 7183 |
01 Apr 2010 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rosser, Roger Lloyd Individual |
R D 1 Takaka 7183 |
11 Oct 1974 - 12 Dec 2022 |
Blackenbrook Wines Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Tasman Gowland Surveyors Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Kaiteriteri Kayaks Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Plant Barn Propagators Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
The Pink Cider Press Co Limited 29 Wallace Street |
|
Ocean View Holiday Park Limited 29 Wallace Street |