Mingi Valley Limited (NZBN 9429040241968) was started on 28 Mar 1939. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 127 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau, Waipukurau, 4200 (type: registered, physical). 127 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau had been their physical address, up until 23 Sep 2019. 201000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 200999 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Murphy, Philip Joseph (an individual) located at R D 2, Waipukurau postcode 4282,
Murphy, Diane Jean (an individual) located at R D 2, Waipukurau postcode 4282. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Murphy, Philip Joseph (an individual) - located at R D 2, Waipukurau. "Non-residential property development (excluding construction" (business classification L671233) is the category the ABS issued Mingi Valley Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 09 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Same As Registered Office | Other (Address for Records) | 17 Feb 1992 |
127 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau, Waipukurau, 4200 | Registered & physical & service | 23 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip Joseph Murphy
R D 2, Waipukurau, 4282
Address used since 07 Sep 2011 |
Director | 19 Mar 1993 - current |
Cedric John Murphy
R D 2, Waipukurau,
Address used since 19 Mar 1993 |
Director | 19 Mar 1993 - 30 Jan 2006 |
James Edward Murphy
Silverstream, Upper Hutt,
Address used since 02 Sep 1988 |
Director | 02 Sep 1988 - 03 Mar 1998 |
Mary Margaret Murphy
Waipukurau,
Address used since 02 Sep 1988 |
Director | 02 Sep 1988 - 24 Aug 1992 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
127 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau, 4200 | Physical | 15 Sep 2015 - 23 Sep 2019 |
Crowe Horwath, 127 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau, 4200 | Registered | 18 Sep 2013 - 23 Sep 2019 |
Whk, 127 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau, 4200 | Physical | 21 Sep 2010 - 15 Sep 2015 |
Whk, 127 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau, 4200 | Registered | 21 Sep 2010 - 18 Sep 2013 |
Whk, 127 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau | Physical & registered | 18 Sep 2009 - 21 Sep 2010 |
Whk Coffey Davidson, 127 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau | Registered & physical | 18 Sep 2007 - 18 Sep 2009 |
Denis Hames & Associates, Chartered Accountants, Northumberland Street, Waipukurau | Physical | 20 Nov 2000 - 20 Nov 2000 |
The Atrium, 127 Ruataniwha Street, Waipukurau | Physical | 20 Nov 2000 - 18 Sep 2007 |
Denis Hames & Associates, Chartered Accountants, Northumberland Street, Waipukurau | Registered | 20 Nov 2000 - 18 Sep 2007 |
Hames Pickett & Co, Chartered Accountants, Northumberland Street, Waipukurau | Physical & registered | 15 Sep 1998 - 20 Nov 2000 |
D B Hames, Northumberland Street, Waipukurau | Registered | 09 Feb 1998 - 15 Sep 1998 |
- | Physical | 17 Feb 1992 - 15 Sep 1998 |
Same As Registered Office | Physical | 17 Feb 1992 - 17 Feb 1992 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Murphy, Philip Joseph Individual |
R D 2 Waipukurau 4282 |
01 Feb 2006 - current |
Murphy, Diane Jean Individual |
R D 2 Waipukurau 4282 |
01 Feb 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Murphy, Philip Joseph Individual |
R D 2 Waipukurau 4282 |
28 Mar 1939 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hames, Denis Bruce Individual |
Waipukurau Waipukurau 4200 |
01 Feb 2006 - 11 Apr 2024 |
Murphy, Cedric John Individual |
R D 2 Waipukurau |
28 Mar 1939 - 01 Feb 2006 |
Jema Investments Limited Crowe Horwath |
|
Central Hawke's Bay Hockey Association (incorporated) Whk Crowe Horwarth |
|
Cjlr Limited 127 Ruataniwha Street |
|
Hewitt Livestock Limited 127 Ruataniwha Street |
|
Wnb Limited 127 Ruataniwha Street |
|
Jayd Enterprises Limited 127 Ruataniwha Street |
Bibby Church Company Limited 207g Pukeora Scenic Road |
Third Axis Limited 353 Brookfields Road |
Joint Union Services Limited 2 Lipton Place |
Great Dane Developments (nz) Limited 12 Ngaire Street |
Tanglin 204 Limited 275 Oxford Street |
Ngati Pahauwera Commercial Development Limited 74 Queen Street |