Godfrey Bros. Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429040574950) was started on 12 Jul 1971. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 67 Normanby Street, Dargaville, 0310 (type: service, registered). 67 Normanby Street, Dargaville had been their registered address, up until 20 May 2016. Godfrey Bros. Limited used other names, namely: Godfrey Bros. Limited from 12 Jul 1971 to 19 Nov 1993. 2000 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Godfrey, Keven Reginald (a director) located at Dargaville, Dargaville postcode 0310. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 40 per cent of all shares (exactly 800 shares); it includes
Godfrey, Patricia Ann (an individual) - located at Dargaville, Dargaville. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (200 shares, 10%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Godfrey, Brian Michael, located at Rd 4, Dargaville (an individual). Our data was updated on 03 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
67 Normanby Street, Dargaville, 0310 | Registered & physical & service | 20 May 2016 |
67 Normanby Street, Dargaville, 0310 | Registered | 13 Jul 2023 |
67 Normanby Street, Dargaville, 0310 | Service | 19 Jul 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Keven Reginald Godfrey
Dargaville, Dargaville, 0310
Address used since 01 Jul 2015 |
Director | 12 Jul 1971 - current |
Kevin Reginald Godfrey
Dargaville, Dargaville, 0310
Address used since 01 Jul 2015 |
Director | 12 Jul 1971 - current |
Patricia Ann Godfrey
Dargaville, Dargaville, 0310
Address used since 01 Jul 2015 |
Director | 01 Aug 1993 - current |
Brian Michael Godfrey
Rd 4, Dargaville, 0374
Address used since 07 Jul 2014 |
Director | 01 Aug 1993 - current |
Errol Clinton Godfrey
Dargaville,
Address used since 30 Sep 1981 |
Director | 30 Sep 1981 - 01 Aug 1993 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
67 Normanby Street, Dargaville, 0310 | Registered & physical | 09 Jul 2013 - 20 May 2016 |
C/-gilmore Brown Limited, 67 Normanby Street, Dargaville | Registered & physical | 22 Jul 2004 - 09 Jul 2013 |
C/- Allen & Allen Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 67 Normanby Street, Dargaville | Registered | 05 Aug 2003 - 22 Jul 2004 |
C/- Allen & Allen, 67 Normanbay Street, Dargaville | Registered | 03 Aug 2000 - 05 Aug 2003 |
C/- Allen & Allen Ltd, 67 Normanby Street, Dargaville | Physical | 27 Jul 1998 - 22 Jul 2004 |
C/- Allen & Allen, Power Board Building, Normanby Street, Dargaville | Registered | 27 Jul 1998 - 03 Aug 2000 |
C/- Allen & Allen, Power Board Building, Normanby Street, Dargaville | Physical | 27 Jul 1998 - 27 Jul 1998 |
C/- Allen & Allen, Chartered Accountants, Normanby Street, Dargaville | Registered | 31 Jul 1997 - 27 Jul 1998 |
Kg Allen Chartered Accountant,, Power Board Building, Normanby Street, Dargaville | Registered | 30 Mar 1994 - 31 Jul 1997 |
Edward St, Dargaville | Registered | 05 Jan 1994 - 30 Mar 1994 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Godfrey, Keven Reginald Director |
Dargaville Dargaville 0310 |
05 Jul 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Godfrey, Patricia Ann Individual |
Dargaville Dargaville 0310 |
12 Jul 1971 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Godfrey, Brian Michael Individual |
Rd 4 Dargaville 0374 |
12 Jul 1971 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Godfrey, Kevin Reginald Individual |
Dargaville Dargaville 0310 |
12 Jul 1971 - 05 Jul 2024 |
Taurua Waingata Farms Limited 67 Normanby Street |
|
M P & S D Groome Limited 67 Normanby Street |
|
Alans Electrical Solutions Limited 67 Normanby Street |
|
Banicevich Brothers Limited 67 Normanby Street |
|
Grbavac Farms Limited 67 Normanby Street |
|
T D H Holdings Limited 67 Normanby Street |