Anscombe Limited (NZBN 9429040890159) was incorporated on 25 Mar 1969. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 3187, Shortland Street, Auckland, 1140 (type: postal, office). 14 Duncan Street, Tawa, Wellington had been their registered address, up to 19 May 2017. Anscombe Limited used more aliases, namely: Anscombe Flats Limited from 25 Mar 1969 to 14 Apr 2004. 133500 shares are allotted to 7 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 26042 shares (19.51 per cent of shares), namely:
The Commonwealth Construction Co. Superannuation Fund (an other) located at Oriental Bay, Wellington postcode 6011. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 19.51 per cent of all shares (26042 shares); it includes
The Sislett Trust (an other) - located at Oriental Bay, Wellington. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (26224 shares, 19.64%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
The Commonwealth Construction Co. Superannuation Fund, located at Oriental Bay, Wellington (an other). "Residential property body corporate" (ANZSIC L671170) is the category the ABS issued Anscombe Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 26 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1st Floor, Dilworth Building, 5 Customs Street East, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 19 May 2017 |
1st Floor, Dilworth Building, 5 Customs Street East, Auckland, 1010 | Office & delivery | 16 Jul 2019 |
Po Box 3187, Shortland Street, Auckland, 1140 | Postal | 16 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Virginia Rosemary Breen
Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 13 Jul 2017
212 Oriental Parade, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 26 Jul 2010 |
Director | 30 May 1997 - current |
Jeffrey Luke Richter
Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 17 Aug 2018
Silverstream, Upper Hutt, 5019
Address used since 03 Aug 2015 |
Director | 16 Oct 2009 - current |
Hamish Paul Sisson
Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 06 May 2020 |
Director | 06 May 2020 - current |
Susan Elizabeth Levett
Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 25 Jan 2023 |
Director | 25 Jan 2023 - current |
Mark Whitaker Levett
Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 16 Jul 2018
212 Oriental Parade, Wellington, 6104
Address used since 22 Dec 2016 |
Director | 22 Dec 2016 - 11 Jul 2023 |
Nicholas William Thomson
Greytown, Greytown, 5712
Address used since 16 Jul 2018
212 Oriental Parade, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 03 Aug 2015
Oriental Bay, Wellington, 6011
Address used since 13 Jul 2017 |
Director | 21 Dec 1998 - 17 Sep 2021 |
Susan Mary Campbell
Wanaka, Wanaka, 9305
Address used since 28 Jan 2016 |
Director | 03 Feb 1999 - 08 Dec 2017 |
Fiona Louise Campbell
Wanaka, Wanaka, 9305
Address used since 28 Jan 2016 |
Director | 09 Jun 2006 - 16 May 2016 |
Dominic Francis Outtrim
212 Oriental Parade, Wellington,
Address used since 25 Oct 2007 |
Director | 25 Oct 2007 - 29 Oct 2007 |
Zita Margaret Outtrim
212 Oriental Parade, Wellington,
Address used since 26 Jul 2004 |
Director | 01 Jul 2001 - 25 Oct 2007 |
Sarah Patricia Todd
212 Oriental Parade, Wellington,
Address used since 26 Jul 2004 |
Director | 30 May 1995 - 09 Jun 2006 |
Brian Chamnes Outtrim
Wellington,
Address used since 06 Dec 1989 |
Director | 06 Dec 1989 - 01 Jul 2001 |
Matthew Garry Barnett
212 Oriental Parade, Wellington,
Address used since 06 Dec 1989 |
Director | 06 Dec 1989 - 22 Jan 1999 |
William Hing
212 Oriental Parade, Wellington,
Address used since 06 Dec 1989 |
Director | 06 Dec 1989 - 21 Dec 1998 |
Judith Jackson
22 Oriental Parade, Wellngton,
Address used since 14 Nov 1996 |
Director | 14 Nov 1996 - 30 May 1997 |
James Heergaard Mcmillan
212 Oriantel Parade, Wellington,
Address used since 18 Oct 1993 |
Director | 18 Oct 1993 - 14 Nov 1996 |
Peter John Kennedy
212 Oriental Parade, Wellington,
Address used since 12 Nov 1989 |
Director | 12 Nov 1989 - 30 May 1995 |
Florence Linda Amos
Wellington,
Address used since 06 Dec 1989 |
Director | 06 Dec 1989 - 20 Jul 1994 |
1st Floor, Dilworth Building, 5 Customs Street East , Auckland , 1010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
14 Duncan Street, Tawa, Wellington, 6104 | Registered & physical | 12 Aug 2015 - 19 May 2017 |
23 Cornwall Street, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered & physical | 12 Sep 2013 - 12 Aug 2015 |
Level 1, 79 Taranaki Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 13 Jul 2012 - 12 Sep 2013 |
C/- Millar & Miller Ltd, 1st Floor, 93 Cuba Mall, Wellington | Physical & registered | 23 Jul 2002 - 13 Jul 2012 |
1st Floor, Hannahs Building, 93 Cuba Street, Wellington | Physical & registered | 23 Jun 1997 - 23 Jul 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Commonwealth Construction Co. Superannuation Fund Other (Other) |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
17 Sep 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Sislett Trust Other (Other) |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
07 Jul 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Commonwealth Construction Co. Superannuation Fund Other (Other) |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
29 Sep 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ftl Trustees (richter) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032873511 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Pipitea Wellington 6011 |
17 Oct 2007 - current |
Richter, Jeffrey Luke Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
31 Aug 2009 - current |
Richter, Mark Lawrence Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
14 Aug 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Breen, Virgina Rosemary Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
25 Mar 1969 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sisson, Hamish Paul Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
12 May 2020 - 07 Jul 2020 |
Campbell, Kevin James Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
26 Jul 2004 - 12 May 2020 |
Levett, Mark Whitaker Individual |
212 Oriental Parade Wellington 6104 |
13 Jul 2017 - 29 Sep 2017 |
Campbell, Fiona Louise Individual |
Wanaka Queenstown 9305 |
14 Aug 2006 - 13 Jul 2017 |
Mouat, John Gordon Individual |
212 Oriental Parade Wellington |
25 Mar 1969 - 02 Jul 2014 |
Alleyne, Odette Marie Individual |
212 Oriental Parade Wellington |
31 Jul 2007 - 30 Oct 2007 |
Campbell, Scott James Individual |
212 Oriental Parade Wellington |
31 Aug 2009 - 13 Jul 2017 |
Todd, Sarah Patricia Individual |
212 Oriental Parade Wellington |
25 Mar 1969 - 03 Aug 2005 |
Campbell, Susan Mary Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
25 Mar 1969 - 12 May 2020 |
Thomson, Charles Allan Individual |
212 Oriental Parade Wellington |
31 Jul 2007 - 22 Nov 2007 |
Ftl Trustees (campbell) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032873412 Company Number: 2102507 Entity |
31 Aug 2009 - 13 Jul 2017 | |
Outtrim, Zita Margaret Individual |
212 Oriental Parade Wellington |
25 Mar 1969 - 17 Oct 2007 |
Thomson, Nicholas William Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
25 Mar 1969 - 17 Sep 2021 |
Thomson, Andrew Charles Individual |
Oriental Bay Wellington 6011 |
31 Jul 2007 - 17 Sep 2021 |
Scw Trustees Limited Other |
14 Aug 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Hughson, Andrew Gray Individual |
212 Oriental Parade Wellington |
25 Mar 1969 - 14 Aug 2006 |
Outtrim, Dominic Frances Individual |
212 Oriental Parade Wellington |
31 Jul 2007 - 30 Oct 2007 |
Ftl Trustees (campbell) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032873412 Company Number: 2102507 Entity |
31 Aug 2009 - 13 Jul 2017 | |
Levett, Mark Whitaker Director |
212 Oriental Parade Wellington 6104 |
13 Jul 2017 - 29 Sep 2017 |
Null - Scw Trustees Limited Other |
14 Aug 2006 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Hawea 2017 Limited 1st Floor, Dilworth Building |
|
Rocket Dental Limited Shop 102 Floor 1 Dilworth Building, 22 Queen Street |
|
Downtown Dental Surgery Limited Suite 102, 1st Floor, Dilworth Building |
|
Strata Title Administration Limited 1st Floor, Dilworth Building |
|
Stunning Smiles Limited Suite 102, Dilworth Building |
Hawea 2017 Limited 1st Floor, Dilworth Building |
Strata Title Administration Limited 1st Floor, Dilworth Building |
Body Corporate Management Limited The Offices Of, Strata Title |
Gloucester Flats Limited 1st Floor, Dilworth Building |
Mawaihakona Flats Limited 1st Floor, Dilworth Building |
Tui Flats Limited 1st Floor, Dilworth Building |