Tuf Heatng Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429041029367) was launched on 11 Dec 2013. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 33A Tosswill Road, Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 (type: postal, office). 116 Grove Street, The Wood, Nelson had been their registered address, until 07 Nov 2016. 500 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 250 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Kouka, Judith Anne (a director) located at Tahunanui, Nelson postcode 7011. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 250 shares); it includes
Kouka, Dennis John (a director) - located at Tahunanui, Nelson. "Heating equipment installation - except industrial furnaces" (ANZSIC E323320) is the classification the ABS issued Tuf Heatng Limited. Our data was updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
33a Tosswill Road, Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Nov 2016 |
33a Tosswill Road, Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 | Postal & office & delivery | 28 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dennis John Kouka
Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 11 Dec 2013 |
Director | 11 Dec 2013 - current |
Judith Anne Kouka
Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 11 Nov 2022
Tahuna, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 29 Sep 2021
Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 21 Jan 2016 |
Director | 11 Dec 2013 - current |
Dennis John Kouka
Enner Glynn, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 11 Dec 2013 |
Director | 11 Dec 2013 - 01 Sep 2014 |
33a Tosswill Road , Tahunanui , Nelson , 7011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
116 Grove Street, The Wood, Nelson, 7010 | Registered & physical | 06 Oct 2015 - 07 Nov 2016 |
10c Calamaras Street, Enner Glynn, Nelson, 7011 | Physical & registered | 11 Dec 2013 - 06 Oct 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kouka, Judith Anne Director |
Tahunanui Nelson 7011 |
11 Dec 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kouka, Dennis John Director |
Tahunanui Nelson 7011 |
26 Jan 2016 - current |
The Ray Win Collection Community Trustboard C/o Mr Ray Win |
|
Syncroflex Limited 19 Tosswill Road |
|
Litmap Limited 7 Chamberlain Street |
|
Egl Limited 58 Tosswill Road |
|
Bowmac Forestry Limited 11 Chamberlain Street |
|
South Island Secondary Schools Netball Association Incorporated 22 Tamaki Street |
Tasman Bay Chimney Services Limited 13-17 Putaitai Street |
M C Flooring Limited 505 High Street |
Negawatt Resources Limited 10 Gadsby Street |
The Chimney Man Limited 108 Main Street |
Moore Enterprises Limited 9 Belvedere Road |
Davy Heating Limited 9 Belvedere Road |