Broods Live Limited (NZBN 9429041031322) was started on 12 Dec 2013. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 10 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 28 Oct 2021. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Nott, Caleb (a director) located at Kelston, Auckland postcode 0602. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Nott, Georgia (a director) - located at Los Angeles, Ca. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 31 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 1, 103 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical & service | 28 Oct 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Caleb Nott
Kelston, Auckland, 0602
Address used since 09 Oct 2020
Richmond, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 06 Mar 2020
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 08 Sep 2015
Kingsland, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 16 Nov 2018 |
Director | 12 Dec 2013 - current |
Georgia Nott
Richmond, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 06 Mar 2020
Stanmore Bay, Whangaparaoa, 0932
Address used since 08 Sep 2015
Kingsland, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 10 Sep 2019 |
Director | 12 Dec 2013 - current |
Ashley Lawrence Page
West Harbour, Auckland, 0618
Address used since 10 Sep 2014
Hobsonville, Auckland, 0616
Address used since 17 Aug 2017 |
Director | 10 Sep 2014 - 06 Mar 2020 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 10 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 18 Nov 2020 - 28 Oct 2021 |
112 Richmond Hill Road, Richmond Hill, Christchurch, 8081 | Registered & physical | 10 Sep 2020 - 18 Nov 2020 |
First Floor. 50 Randolph Street, Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 18 Sep 2019 - 10 Sep 2020 |
50 Randolph Street, Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 01 Oct 2014 - 18 Sep 2019 |
519 New North Road, Kingsland, Auckland, 1021 | Physical & registered | 12 Dec 2013 - 01 Oct 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nott, Caleb Director |
Kelston Auckland 0602 |
12 Dec 2013 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Nott, Georgia Director |
Los Angeles Ca 90039 |
12 Dec 2013 - current |
Loop Media NZ Limited 50 Randolph Street |
|
Bigpop Music Publishing Limited 50 Randolph Street |
|
Little Pop Productions Limited 50 Randolph Street |
|
Crs One Limited 50 Randolph Street |
|
Dimmer Limited 50 Randolph Street |
|
Che Fu Entertainment Limited 50 Randolph Street |