120 Prebensen Drive Limited (issued a business number of 9429041138397) was registered on 19 Mar 2014. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 36 Bridge Street, Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 (type: service, registered). 3 Byron Street, Napier South, Napier had been their physical address, up until 14 Feb 2022. 1000 shares are issued to 8 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 210 shares (21% of shares), namely:
Cheyne, Ian James (an individual) located at Taradale, Napier postcode 4112,
Cheyne, Elizabeth Nona (an individual) located at Taradale, Napier postcode 4112. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 6.3% of all shares (exactly 63 shares); it includes
Madams, Craig (an individual) - located at Marewa, Napier,
Anderson, Katie Jayne (an individual) - located at Marewa, Napier. Next there is the next group of shareholders, share allotment (37 shares, 3.7%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Clark, Keegan Lee, located at Rd 2, Napier (an individual),
Clark, David Peter, located at Rd 2, Napier (an individual). "Investment - commercial property" (business classification L671230) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to 120 Prebensen Drive Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 20 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Maritime Building, 3 Byron Street, Napier, 4110 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Feb 2022 |
36 Bridge Street, Ahuriri, Napier, 4110 | Service & registered | 13 Mar 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Terence Ian Elmsly
Rd 3, Napier, 4183
Address used since 19 Mar 2014 |
Director | 19 Mar 2014 - current |
Mark Andrew Taylor
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 19 Mar 2014 |
Director | 19 Mar 2014 - 30 Sep 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3 Byron Street, Napier South, Napier, 4110 | Physical & registered | 16 Nov 2016 - 14 Feb 2022 |
Level 4, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 19 Mar 2014 - 16 Nov 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cheyne, Ian James Individual |
Taradale Napier 4112 |
08 Nov 2016 - current |
Cheyne, Elizabeth Nona Individual |
Taradale Napier 4112 |
08 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Madams, Craig Individual |
Marewa Napier 4110 |
17 Sep 2021 - current |
Anderson, Katie Jayne Individual |
Marewa Napier 4110 |
17 Sep 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clark, Keegan Lee Individual |
Rd 2 Napier 4182 |
17 Sep 2021 - current |
Clark, David Peter Individual |
Rd 2 Napier 4182 |
17 Sep 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Elmsly, Terence Ian Director |
Rd 3 Napier 4183 |
19 Mar 2014 - current |
Elmsly, Christina Ellen Individual |
Rd 3 Napier 4183 |
19 Mar 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lunn, Stephen Peter Individual |
Bluff Hill Napier 4110 |
19 Mar 2014 - 23 Jul 2021 |
Lunn, Stephen Peter Individual |
Bluff Hill Napier 4110 |
19 Mar 2014 - 23 Jul 2021 |
Prospect Custodian Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037829117 Company Number: 911584 Entity |
19 Mar 2014 - 08 Nov 2016 | |
Prospect Custodian Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037829117 Company Number: 911584 Entity |
19 Mar 2014 - 08 Nov 2016 |
Soundhaus By Schuler Limited 3 Byron Street |
|
Aaron Dooney - Barrister Limited 3 Byron Street |
|
Charleston Pharmacy Limited 3 Byron Street |
|
Napier Pharmacy Limited 3 Byron Street |
|
Tucker Trustee Company Limited 3 Byron Street |
|
Glenview Settlement Trustee Company Limited 3 Byron Street |
The Dads Limited 86 Station Street |
Kimono Capital Limited 93 Station Street |
Seaview Buildings Limited 9a Colenso Avenue |
Pennos Buildings Limited 9a Colenso Avenue |
Penlin Buildings Limited 9a Colenso Avenue |
Tremains Taradale Development Limited 73 Raffles Street |