Bpc Cafe Group Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041181560) was started on 07 Apr 2014. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 258 Palmerston Street, Westport, Westport, 7825 (type: delivery, registered). 257A Queen Street, Richmond had been their registered address, up to 05 Aug 2024. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Lucas, Emily (a director) located at Westport, Westport postcode 7825. "Coffee shops" (ANZSIC H451120) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Bpc Cafe Group Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
77 Tahunanui Drive, Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 | Physical | 12 Jul 2018 |
Flat 2, 177 Jervois Road, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Delivery & postal | 23 Jul 2019 |
257a Queen Street, Richmond, 7020 | Registered & service | 05 Aug 2024 |
258 Palmerston Street, Westport, Westport, 7825 | Delivery | 13 Aug 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Emily Lucas
Westport, Westport, 7825
Address used since 28 Jul 2020
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 04 Jul 2018
Onetangi, Waiheke Island, 1081
Address used since 01 Dec 2015 |
Director | 07 Apr 2014 - current |
Tom Lucas
Westport, Westport, 7825
Address used since 04 Apr 2022 |
Director | 04 Apr 2022 - 01 Jun 2024 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
258 Palmerston Street, Westport, Westport, 7825 | Delivery | 13 Aug 2024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
257a Queen Street, Richmond, 7020 | Registered & service | 08 Aug 2023 - 05 Aug 2024 |
77 Tahunanui Drive, Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 | Service | 12 Jul 2018 - 08 Aug 2023 |
77 Tahunanui Drive, Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 | Registered | 21 Jun 2018 - 08 Aug 2023 |
77 Tahunanui Drive, Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 | Physical | 07 Apr 2014 - 12 Jul 2018 |
77 Tahunanui Drive, Tahunanui, Nelson, 7011 | Registered | 07 Apr 2014 - 21 Jun 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lucas, Emily Director |
Westport Westport 7825 |
07 Apr 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lucas, Tom Individual |
Westport Westport 7825 |
04 Apr 2022 - 01 Jul 2024 |
Lucas, Tom Individual |
Westport Westport 7825 |
04 Apr 2022 - 01 Jul 2024 |
Eat Healthy Limited 77 Tahunanui Drive |
|
Gunna Farm Limited 77 Tahunanui Drive |
|
T C Construction Limited 77 Tahunanui Drive |
|
Pg Richmond Builders Limited 77 Tahunanui Drive |
|
Lorraine Crowhen Limited 77 Tahunanui Drive |
|
Coast Fm Limited 77 Tahunanui Drive |
J & M Blundell Limited 145 Vanguard Street |
Keneperu Trading Limited 70 Arrow Street |
Kush Coffee Limited 5 Church Street |
Nelson Regional Foods Limited 270 Trafalgar Street |
Crema Espresso 2011 Limited Whitby House, Level 3, 7 Alma Street |
Saharaz Holdings Limited 314a Nayland Road |