Noa Farms (2014) Limited (issued a business number of 9429041242186) was launched on 21 May 2014. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 20 Arawa Street, Matamata, 3400 (type: registered, physical). 13 Mclean Street, Tauranga had been their registered address, until 03 Feb 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Cg Trustee 2021 Limited (an entity) located at Matamata postcode 3400,
Clarke, Elle Rae (a director) located at Rd 2, Cambridge postcode 3494,
Clarke, Simon Ronald (a director) located at Rd 2, Cambridge postcode 3494. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Clarke, Elle Rae (a director) - located at Rd 2, Cambridge. The next group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Clarke, Simon Ronald, located at Rd 2, Cambridge (a director). Our database was last updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 Arawa Street, Matamata, 3400 | Registered & physical & service | 03 Feb 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Elle Rae Clarke
Rd 2, Cambridge, 3494
Address used since 11 May 2015 |
Director | 21 May 2014 - current |
Simon Ronald Clarke
Rd 2, Cambridge, 3494
Address used since 11 May 2015 |
Director | 21 May 2014 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
13 Mclean Street, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical | 15 Sep 2020 - 03 Feb 2021 |
13 Mclean Street, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical | 21 May 2014 - 15 Sep 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cg Trustee 2021 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048933087 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Matamata 3400 |
01 Aug 2022 - current |
Clarke, Elle Rae Director |
Rd 2 Cambridge 3494 |
21 May 2014 - current |
Clarke, Simon Ronald Director |
Rd 2 Cambridge 3494 |
21 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clarke, Elle Rae Director |
Rd 2 Cambridge 3494 |
21 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clarke, Simon Ronald Director |
Rd 2 Cambridge 3494 |
21 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Holland Beckett Trustee No.14 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041065730 Company Number: 4911799 Entity |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
21 May 2014 - 01 Aug 2022 |
Holland Beckett Trustee No.14 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041065730 Company Number: 4911799 Entity |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
21 May 2014 - 01 Aug 2022 |
Testament Investments Limited Suite 3, 13 Mclean Street |
|
In-out Limited 13 Mclean Street |
|
Stoke Rentals Limited 13 Mclean Street |
|
Developing Potential Limited 13 Mclean Street |
|
M.d. Rural Limited 13 Mclean Street |
|
Body Mechanics Personal Training Limited 13 Mclean Street |