Ngakaunui Farm Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041243459) was incorporated on 26 May 2014. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 76 Fergusson Street, Feilding, 4702 (type: physical, registered). 76 Fergusson Street, Feilding had been their registered address, until 03 Jan 2019. 120 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 60 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Kelaay Farm Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at Feilding, Feilding postcode 4702,
Paki, Petrina (an individual) located at Rd 5, Feilding postcode 4775,
Heap, Bevan (a director) located at Rd 5, Feilding postcode 4775. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 41.67% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Heap, Bevan (a director) - located at Rd 5, Feilding. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allotment (10 shares, 8.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Paki, Petrina, located at Rd 5, Feilding (an individual). "Milk production - dairy cattle" (business classification A016020) is the category the ABS issued to Ngakaunui Farm Limited. Our data was last updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
76 Fergusson Street, Feilding, 4702 | Physical & registered & service | 03 Jan 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bevan Heap
Rd 5, Feilding, 4775
Address used since 14 Dec 2020
Feilding, Feilding, 4702
Address used since 26 May 2014 |
Director | 26 May 2014 - current |
Frederick Heap
Rd 5, Feilding, 4775
Address used since 26 May 2014 |
Director | 26 May 2014 - 06 Sep 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
76 Fergusson Street, Feilding, 4702 | Registered & physical | 24 Nov 2014 - 03 Jan 2019 |
1063 Camerons Line, Rd 5, Feilding, 4775 | Physical & registered | 26 May 2014 - 24 Nov 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kelaay Farm Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429050777501 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Feilding Feilding 4702 |
13 Sep 2022 - current |
Paki, Petrina Individual |
Rd 5 Feilding 4775 |
26 May 2014 - current |
Heap, Bevan Director |
Rd 5 Feilding 4775 |
26 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heap, Bevan Director |
Rd 5 Feilding 4775 |
26 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Paki, Petrina Individual |
Rd 5 Feilding 4775 |
26 May 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heap, Frederick Individual |
Rd 5 Feilding 4775 |
26 May 2014 - 13 Sep 2022 |
Heap, Barbara Individual |
Rd 5 Feilding 4775 |
26 May 2014 - 13 Sep 2022 |
Bailey Shearing Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
|
M & M Livestock Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
|
Iron Man Roofing Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
|
The Secret Farmer Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
|
Carpe Diem Dairies Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
|
Arnold Farming Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
Roman Enterprise Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
Percy Farms Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
Mackindad Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
Jecolm Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
Mclean Farm Holdings Limited 53-55 Manchester Street |
Tplp Farm Investments Limited Level 1 |