East Otago Farming Services Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041333914) was started on 24 Jul 2014. 6 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 6, Waikouaiti, Waikouaiti, 9541 (type: postal, office). 19 Kildare Street, Waikouaiti, Waikouaiti had been their registered address, up to 17 Aug 2015. 100 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 25 shares (25 per cent of shares), namely:
Tamepo, Annie (an individual) located at Halfway Bush, Dunedin postcode 9010. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25 per cent of all shares (25 shares); it includes
Paul, Alison Claire (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Waikouaiti. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (25 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Paul, Gregory James, located at Rd 2, Waikouaiti (a director). "Shearing services" (business classification A052220) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued East Otago Farming Services Limited. Our information was last updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
187 Flag Swamp Rd, Waikouaiti, Waikouaiti, 9472 | Registered | 17 Aug 2015 |
187 Flag Swamp Rd, Waikouaiti, Waikouaiti, 9472 | Physical & service | 27 Sep 2016 |
Po Box 6, Waikouaiti, Waikouaiti, 9541 | Postal & invoice | 23 Jul 2019 |
187 Flag Swamp Rd, Waikouaiti, Waikouaiti, 9472 | Office & delivery | 23 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gregory James Paul
Rd 2, Waikouaiti, 9472
Address used since 08 Aug 2015 |
Director | 24 Jul 2014 - current |
Robert Tamepo
Halfway Bush, Dunedin, 9010
Address used since 24 Jul 2014 |
Director | 24 Jul 2014 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
187 Flag Swamp Rd, Waikouaiti, Waikouaiti, 9472 | Office & delivery | 23 Jul 2019 |
187 Flag Swamp Rd , Waikouaiti , Waikouaiti , 9472 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
19 Kildare Street, Waikouaiti, Waikouaiti, 9510 | Registered | 24 Jul 2014 - 17 Aug 2015 |
19 Kildare Street, Waikouaiti, Waikouaiti, 9510 | Physical | 24 Jul 2014 - 27 Sep 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tamepo, Annie Individual |
Halfway Bush Dunedin 9010 |
24 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul, Alison Claire Individual |
Rd 2 Waikouaiti 9472 |
24 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul, Gregory James Director |
Rd 2 Waikouaiti 9472 |
24 Jul 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tamepo, Robert Director |
Halfway Bush Dunedin 9010 |
24 Jul 2014 - current |
Asbic Consultants Limited 229 Flag Swamp Road |
|
Hawksbury Motors Limited 3881 Palmerston Waikouaiti Road |
|
Cypress Builders Limited 21 Aberdeen Street |
|
Mcneill Rural Services Limited 102 District Road |
|
Golden Fleece Good Samaritan Club Trust 125 Main Road |
|
Jamaan Properties Limited 61 Forfar Street |
Owaka Shearing Limited 17-19 John Street |
Moore Sheep Shearing Limited 17-19 John Street |
Shearmadness Limited 102 Wix Road |
Southern Heights Limited 24 Mathesons Corner Road |
Waimate Shearing (2011) Limited 53-55 Sophia Street |
Burr Crutching Limited 15a Hokonui Drive |