Signature Marketing New Zealand Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041374351) was registered on 28 Aug 2014. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 305637, Triton Plaza, Auckland, 0757 (type: postal, office). Level 4, 52 Symonds Street, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 04 Mar 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 10 shares (10% of shares), namely:
Finco3A Pty Ltd (an other) located at South Yarra, Victoria postcode 3141. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 90% of all shares (exactly 90 shares); it includes
Signature Marketing Australia Pty Limited (an other) - located at 15 Claremont Street, South Yarrow, Melbourne, Victoria. "Wholesale trade nec" (business classification F373970) is the classification the ABS issued to Signature Marketing New Zealand Limited. Our data was updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
25a Triton Drive, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & service & registered | 04 Mar 2016 |
Po Box 305637, Triton Plaza, Auckland, 0757 | Postal | 04 May 2021 |
25a Triton Drive, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 | Office & delivery | 04 May 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew Richard Poore
Gulf Harbour, Gulf Harbour, 0930
Address used since 01 May 2022
Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932
Address used since 11 Nov 2019 |
Director | 11 Nov 2019 - current |
Nicholas Peter Dobromilsky
South Yarra, Victoria, 3141
Address used since 31 May 2018
South Yarra, Victoria, 3141
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 31 May 2018 - 11 Nov 2019 |
Anthony John Sutherland
Tallebudgera, Queensland, 4228
Address used since 31 May 2018
South Yarra, Victoria, 3141
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 31 May 2018 - 16 Apr 2019 |
Chris Bissiotis
Queensland, 4220
Address used since 31 May 2018
South Yarra, 3141
Address used since 01 Jan 1970 |
Director | 31 May 2018 - 15 Apr 2019 |
Gregory Norman Sean Kerr
South Yarra, Victoria, 3141
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Glen Iris, Victoria, 3146
Address used since 31 May 2018 |
Director | 31 May 2018 - 31 Jul 2018 |
Andrew Poore
Silverdale, Silverdale, 0932
Address used since 27 Apr 2017 |
Director | 28 Aug 2014 - 31 May 2018 |
25a Triton Drive , Rosedale , Auckland , 0632 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 52 Symonds Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 28 Aug 2014 - 04 Mar 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Finco3a Pty Ltd Other (Other) |
South Yarra Victoria 3141 |
25 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Signature Marketing Australia Pty Limited Other (Other) |
15 Claremont Street, South Yarrow Melbourne, Victoria 3141 |
28 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Poore, Andrew Individual |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 |
28 Aug 2014 - 25 Jul 2018 |
S.c. Johnson & Son Proprietary Limited Level 8, 79 Queen St |
|
Nicholls & Maher (nz) Limited Level 4, Bdo Centre, 4 Graham Street |
|
D M Dunningham Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Mj Wyborn Ventures Limited Level 5, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |
|
Corvus Oteha Valley Joint Venture Limited Level 4, 52 Symonds Street |
|
Corvus New Zealand Limited Level 4, 52 Symonds Street |
S.c. Johnson & Son Proprietary Limited Level 8, 79 Queen St |
International Direct Importer Limited 220 Queen Street |
Kaihoe Trading Limited 6th Floor, 350 Queen Street |
New Zealand Nutri Products Limited 5e 166-174 Queen Street |
Bright Five Limited Unit 1, 43 High Street |
Jpgsm Limited Level 10, Wellesley Centre |