Mcivor-Seddon Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041374863) was registered on 28 Aug 2014. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House, 136 Ilam Road, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 (type: physical, registered). 12 Sayers Crescent, Ilam, Christchurch had been their physical address, up until 03 Jul 2015. 1000 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Mcivor, Janine Robyn (a director) located at Burwood, Christchurch postcode 8083. "Rental of residential property" (ANZSIC L671160) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Mcivor-Seddon Holdings Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 25 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House, 136 Ilam Road, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 | Physical & registered & service | 03 Jul 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Janine Robyn Mcivor
Burwood, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 08 Sep 2014 |
Director | 28 Aug 2014 - current |
Rod Harvey Seddon
Burwood, Christchurch, 8083
Address used since 08 Sep 2014 |
Director | 28 Aug 2014 - 04 Mar 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
12 Sayers Crescent, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 | Physical & registered | 28 Aug 2014 - 03 Jul 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcivor, Janine Robyn Director |
Burwood Christchurch 8083 |
28 Aug 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Seddon, Rod Harvey Individual |
Burwood Christchurch 8083 |
28 Aug 2014 - 06 Mar 2019 |
New Zealand Health Food Company Limited Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House |
|
Orchard Lane Limited Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House |
|
Canterbury Dorpers Limited Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House |
|
Macklin Consultancy Limited Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House |
|
Chapman Agriculture Limited Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House |
|
Entire Electrical Solutions Limited Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House |
J & A Mcdowell Investments Limited Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House |
K.a.s Rentals Limited Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House |
D & G Holdings Limited Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House |
Bjs Rentals 2000 Limited Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House |
L & D 2010 Limited 27 Wilfrid Street |
Cnx Investment Limited 56a Creyke Road |