Matamata Vape Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041399149) was registered on 05 Sep 2014. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 119 Manners Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 (type: office, registered). 53 O'rorke Road, Penrose, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 09 Mar 2022. Matamata Vape Limited used other aliases, namely: Party Vape Limited from 05 Sep 2014 to 11 Feb 2022. 10000 shares are allocated to 12 shareholders who belong to 8 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 6999 shares (69.99 per cent of shares), namely:
Chea, Lina (an individual) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2019,
Chhun, Bunleng (an individual) located at Flat Bush, Auckland postcode 2019. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 9.99 per cent of all shares (exactly 999 shares); it includes
Gupta, Abhinav (an individual) - located at Penrose, Auckland,
Dutta, Shivali (an individual) - located at Penrose, Auckland. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (999 shares, 9.99%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Sattoor, Keerthi, located at Flat Bush, Auckland (an individual),
Mekala, Srinivas, located at Flat Bush, Auckland (an individual). "Tobacco product retailing" (ANZSIC G427977) is the category the ABS issued Matamata Vape Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 31 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
119 Manners Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Office | unknown |
121 Pakuranga Road, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 | Registered & physical & service | 09 Mar 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Himanshu Mittal
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 01 Mar 2022
Penrose, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 02 Oct 2020
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 01 Feb 2016
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 01 Feb 2016 |
Director | 05 Sep 2014 - current |
Abhinav Gupta
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 26 Apr 2017
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 01 Feb 2016 |
Director | 01 Feb 2016 - 26 Aug 2018 |
119 Manners Street , Te Aro , Wellington , 6011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
53 O'rorke Road, Penrose, Auckland, 1061 | Physical & registered | 29 Jun 2018 - 09 Mar 2022 |
37 Church Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Registered | 09 Apr 2018 - 29 Jun 2018 |
119 Manners Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 02 May 2017 - 09 Apr 2018 |
37 Church Street, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Physical | 02 May 2017 - 29 Jun 2018 |
94 Manukau Road, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 05 Sep 2014 - 02 May 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chea, Lina Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
12 May 2017 - current |
Chhun, Bunleng Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
05 Sep 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gupta, Abhinav Individual |
Penrose Auckland 1061 |
05 Sep 2014 - current |
Dutta, Shivali Individual |
Penrose Auckland 1061 |
12 May 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sattoor, Keerthi Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
12 May 2017 - current |
Mekala, Srinivas Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
05 Sep 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gupta, Abhinav Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
05 Sep 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Garg, Paayal Individual |
Penrose Auckland 1061 |
12 May 2017 - current |
Mittal, Himanshu Director |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
05 Sep 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mittal, Himanshu Director |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
05 Sep 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chhun, Bunleng Individual |
Flat Bush Auckland 2019 |
05 Sep 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mekala, Srinivas Individual |
Penrose Auckland 1061 |
05 Sep 2014 - current |
Silver Spoon Limited 121 Manners Street |
|
Adrians Hairstylist Limited 1st Floor |
|
Empa Group Consultants Limited 1st Floor |
|
Urban Villas Limited 121 Manners St |
|
Lilem Limited 111 Manners Street |
|
Krave Grill Limited 131 Manners Street |
Kolotex Porirua Limited Floor 2, 82 Willis Street |
Richmond Discount Limited 257a Queen Street |
West Coast Vape Limited 64 High Street |
Bs Fresh Limited 13 Elizabeth Avenue |
Stencil Limited 13a Viola Avenue |
Shisha Hookah Limited 53 O'rorke Road |