Thomas Knight Nominees Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041517857) was launched on 01 Dec 2014. 1 address is currently in use by the company: 67 High Street, Hawera, Hawera, 4610 (type: registered, physical). 10 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 10 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Dean Pratt (an individual) located at Rd 14, Hawera postcode 4674. "Unit trust operation (investment type, in predominantly financial assets)" (business classification K624070) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Thomas Knight Nominees Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 09 Sep 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
67 High Street, Hawera, Hawera, 4610 | Registered & physical | 01 Dec 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Ernest Booker
Rd 21, Stratford, 4391
Address used since 02 Dec 2014 |
Director | 02 Dec 2014 - current |
Sandra Caroline Gates
Rd 15, Hawera, 4675
Address used since 24 Aug 2020 |
Director | 24 Aug 2020 - current |
Don Graeme Worthington
Hawera, Hawera, 4610
Address used since 01 Dec 2014 |
Director | 01 Dec 2014 - 02 Dec 2014 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dean Michael Pratt Individual |
Rd 14 Hawera 4674 |
31 Aug 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Don Graeme Worthington Individual |
Hawera Hawera 4610 |
01 Dec 2014 - 31 Aug 2020 |
Wallis Cameron Developments Limited 67 High Street |
|
Lomas Nominees Limited 67 High Street |
|
D & C Hughes Trustee Limited 67 High Street |
|
Lrc Investments Limited 67 High Street |
|
Dwyer Farms Limited 67 High Street |
|
C A Dwyer Nominees Limited 67 High Street |
Shohni-haylee Trustees Limited 136 Powderham Street |
Tilly Nominees Limited 9 Arawa Street |
Floell Limited 20 Simpson Crescent |
Sharon Warburton Trustee Limited 93 Maniapoto Street |
Greatlife Beneficiaries Limited 4 Morere Street |
Comet Adventures Limited 93 Discovery Drive |