Hyde Park Village Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041537350) was incorporated on 16 Dec 2014. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 18 Sue Avenue, Otaki, Otaki, 5512 (type: physical, service). 69 Rutherford Street, Lower Hutt had been their physical address, up to 25 Jun 2020. 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Everiss, John Arnold (a director) located at Otaki, Otaki postcode 5512. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Everiss, Barbara Joan (an individual) - located at Otaki, Otaki,
Everiss, Barbara Joan (a director) - located at Otaki, Otaki. "Rental of commercial property" (business classification L671250) is the classification the ABS issued to Hyde Park Village Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 08 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
69 Rutherford Street, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered | 16 Dec 2014 |
18 Sue Avenue, Otaki, Otaki, 5512 | Physical & service | 25 Jun 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Arnold Everiss
Otaki, Otaki, 5512
Address used since 16 Dec 2014 |
Director | 16 Dec 2014 - current |
Barbara Joan Everiss
Otaki, Otaki, 5512
Address used since 16 Dec 2014 |
Director | 16 Dec 2014 - 23 Apr 2024 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
69 Rutherford Street, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Physical | 16 Dec 2014 - 25 Jun 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Everiss, John Arnold Director |
Otaki Otaki 5512 |
16 Dec 2014 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Everiss, Barbara Joan Individual |
Otaki Otaki 5512 |
16 Dec 2014 - current |
Everiss, Barbara Joan Director |
Otaki Otaki 5512 |
16 Dec 2014 - current |
W M Bamford & Co Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
|
Dovella Homes Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
|
Teachertalk Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
|
Carterton Medical Centre (2013) Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
|
Evergreens Group Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
|
Gaffney Jones Trustees Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
Gordos Enterprises Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
H3k Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
Ksd Holdings Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
Mijax Investments Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
Port Road Properties Limited 69 Rutherford Street |
Reedco Limited 69 Rutherford Street |