Hollow Point Pastures Limited (issued a business number of 9429041622247) was started on 24 Feb 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 17 Rawhiti Street, Taupo, Taupo, 3330 (type: registered, physical). 17 Rawhiti Street, Taupō, Taupō had been their registered address, up until 21 Oct 2022. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Wynyard, Malinda Jane (an individual) located at Taupo, Taupo postcode 3330. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Sanderson, Ryan Alan Axbey (a director) - located at Taupo, Taupo. "Repair (general) or renovation of non-residential buildings nec" (ANZSIC E302020) is the classification the ABS issued Hollow Point Pastures Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
17 Rawhiti Street, Taupo, Taupo, 3330 | Registered & physical & service | 21 Oct 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ryan Alan Axbey Sanderson
Taupo, Taupo, 3330
Address used since 12 Oct 2022
Matawai, 4075
Address used since 31 Mar 2020
Rd 44, Urenui, 4377
Address used since 04 Oct 2016 |
Director | 24 Feb 2015 - current |
313 Te Wera Road , Matawai , 4075 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
17 Rawhiti Street, Taupō, Taupō, 3330 | Registered & physical | 20 Oct 2022 - 21 Oct 2022 |
313 Te Wera Road, Matawai, 4075 | Registered & physical | 08 Apr 2020 - 20 Oct 2022 |
141e Allen Road, Broadlands, 3081 | Registered & physical | 01 Nov 2017 - 08 Apr 2020 |
603 Mokau Road, Rd 44, Urenui, 4388 | Registered | 14 Oct 2016 - 01 Nov 2017 |
603 Mokau Road, Rd 44, Urenui, 4388 | Physical | 13 Oct 2016 - 01 Nov 2017 |
603 Mokau Road, Rd 44, Urenui, 4377 | Registered | 12 Oct 2016 - 14 Oct 2016 |
603 Mokau Road, Rd 44, Urenui, 4377 | Physical | 12 Oct 2016 - 13 Oct 2016 |
827 Hilderthorpe-pukeuri Road, Rd 7h, Oamaru, 9493 | Registered & physical | 22 Jul 2015 - 12 Oct 2016 |
685 Norfolk Road, Rd 8, Inglewood, 4388 | Physical & registered | 24 Feb 2015 - 22 Jul 2015 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wynyard, Malinda Jane Individual |
Taupo Taupo 3330 |
24 Feb 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sanderson, Ryan Alan Axbey Director |
Taupo Taupo 3330 |
24 Feb 2015 - current |
Montero Trustee Services Limited 113 Allan Road |
|
Ariki Farming Limited 323a Allen Road |
|
Wills Creek Farms Limited 2650 Broadlands Road |
|
Glengour Limited 2529a Broadlands Road |
|
Kilston Farming Limited 2529 Broadlands Road |
|
Danevike Limited 11 Earle Road |
Maintenance Technologies Limited 14 Mokorua Grove |
Secure Maintainance Limited 18 Mangauika Road |
Bear Limited 6 Twin Oaks Drive |
2 Build Limited 6 Twin Oaks Drive |
Nsb Property Investments Limited Level 1, Gardiner Knobloch House |
Jack&jane Limited 102a Bader Street |