D & P Torckler Trustee Company Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041623169) was started on 24 Feb 2015. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 19, 41 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: service, registered). 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Mcgivern, Shaun Michael (a director) located at Mount Eden, Auckland postcode 1024. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Molloy, Benedict Philip (a director) - located at Point Wells. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the category the ABS issued D & P Torckler Trustee Company Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
34 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Feb 2015 |
Level 19, 41 Shortland Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Service & registered | 30 Jun 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shaun Michael Mcgivern
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 26 Mar 2019 |
Director | 26 Mar 2019 - current |
Benedict Philip Molloy
Point Wells, 0986
Address used since 08 May 2024
Omaha, 0986
Address used since 09 May 2022
Rd 5, Matakana, 0985
Address used since 26 Mar 2019 |
Director | 26 Mar 2019 - current |
Amanda Jane Donovan
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 17 Mar 2021 |
Director | 17 Mar 2021 - current |
Gerard Michael Molloy
Kingsland, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 26 Mar 2019
Glen Eden, Auckland, 0604
Address used since 24 Feb 2015 |
Director | 24 Feb 2015 - 24 Mar 2021 |
Rochelle Anne Munro
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 24 Feb 2015 |
Director | 24 Feb 2015 - 01 Apr 2019 |
David Anthony Lyon
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 24 Feb 2015 |
Director | 24 Feb 2015 - 08 Aug 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcgivern, Shaun Michael Director |
Mount Eden Auckland 1024 |
01 Apr 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Molloy, Benedict Philip Director |
Point Wells 0986 |
02 Apr 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Molloy, Gerard Michael Individual |
Kingsland Auckland 1021 |
24 Feb 2015 - 01 Apr 2021 |
Munro, Rochelle Anne Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
24 Feb 2015 - 02 Apr 2019 |
Eclairs Childcare (henderson) Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
|
Te Tiaki Trust Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
|
Pynenburg Trustees Limited Level 14 |
|
Markgraaff Trustee Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
|
Private Estates NZ Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
|
Eclairs Childcare Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
Te Tiaki Trust Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
Markgraaff Trustee Limited Level 10, The Dorchester Build |
Sierra Trustee Company Limited 34 Shortland Street |
Cik Trustee Limited 34 Shortland Street |
Hill Valley Trustee Limited 34 Shortland Street |
Brunton Trustee Services Limited 34 Shortland Street |