Hollows Electrical Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041630594) was incorporated on 27 Feb 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 44 Heuheu Street, Taupo, Taupo, 3330 (type: physical, service). 44 Heuheu Street, Taupo, Taupo had been their registered address, up until 30 Nov 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 30 shares (30 per cent of shares), namely:
Hollows, Melissa Shannon (an individual) located at Rd 4, Taupo postcode 3384. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 70 per cent of all shares (70 shares); it includes
Hollows, Timothy David Gillingham (a director) - located at Rd 4, Taupo. "Electrical services" (business classification E323220) is the classification the ABS issued Hollows Electrical Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
44 Heuheu Street, Taupo, Taupo, 3330 | Registered | 30 Nov 2018 |
44 Heuheu Street, Taupo, Taupo, 3330 | Physical & service | 27 Feb 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Timothy David Gillingham Hollows
Rd 4, Taupo, 3384
Address used since 04 Jul 2024
Rd 5, Taupo, 3385
Address used since 02 Jul 2020
Rd 5, Taupo, 3385
Address used since 27 Oct 2016
Acacia Bay, Taupo, 3330
Address used since 18 Jun 2018 |
Director | 27 Feb 2015 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
44 Heuheu Street, Taupo, Taupo, 3330 | Registered | 28 Jul 2016 - 30 Nov 2018 |
44 Heuheu Street, Taupo, Taupo, 3330 | Physical | 28 Jul 2016 - 27 Feb 2019 |
17 Cherry Lane, Acacia Bay, Taupo, 3330 | Physical & registered | 27 Feb 2015 - 28 Jul 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hollows, Melissa Shannon Individual |
Rd 4 Taupo 3384 |
04 Jul 2024 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hollows, Timothy David Gillingham Director |
Rd 4 Taupo 3384 |
27 Feb 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcinnes, Melissa Shannon Individual |
Rd 5 Taupo 3385 |
12 May 2021 - 04 Jul 2024 |
Wills Way Dairies Limited 44 Heuheu Street |
|
Stevens Electrical Limited 44 Heuheu Street |
|
Volcanic Plateau Harvesting Limited 44 Heuheu Street |
|
Bella Ridge Farms Limited 44 Heuheu Street |
|
Lake Furnishings Limited 44 Heuheu Street |
|
Stolzenberg Farms Limited 44 Heuheu Street |
Stevens Electrical Limited 44 Heuheu Street |
Central Power And Instrumentation 2011 Limited Le Rew Building |
Top Sparks Limited 77 Titiraupenga Street |
Scotty's Electrical Xpertise Limited 145b Spa Rd |
Jay Jay Electrical Contractors Limited 6 Whakaipo Avenue |
Gt Electrical Plus Limited 54 Taupo View Road |