Peak Maintenance Hawkes Bay Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041667514) was launched on 30 Mar 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 205 Hastings Street South, Hastings, 4122 (type: registered, physical). 205 Hastings Street, South, Hastings, Hastings had been their registered address, up to 24 Apr 2019. 1500 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 750 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Judd, Peter James Carr (a director) located at Parkvale, Hastings postcode 4122. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (750 shares); it includes
Allen, Grayson John (a director) - located at Hastings. "Plumbing - except marine" (ANZSIC E323150) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Peak Maintenance Hawkes Bay Limited. Our information was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
205 Hastings Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical & service | 24 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peter James Carr Judd
Parkvale, Hastings, 4122
Address used since 30 Mar 2015 |
Director | 30 Mar 2015 - current |
Grayson John Allen
Hastings, 4172
Address used since 30 Mar 2015 |
Director | 30 Mar 2015 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
205 Hastings Street, South, Hastings, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical | 28 Nov 2016 - 24 Apr 2019 |
1017 Heretaunga St East, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical | 30 Mar 2015 - 28 Nov 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Judd, Peter James Carr Director |
Parkvale Hastings 4122 |
30 Mar 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Allen, Grayson John Director |
Hastings 4172 |
30 Mar 2015 - current |
Rtl Consulting Limited 205 Hastings Street South |
|
Bruce Trustee Company Limited 205 Hastings Street South |
|
Bay Rheumatology Limited 205 Hastings Street |
|
Bate Hallett Trustees (no. 4) Limited 205 Hastings Street South |
|
W & D Woodward Family Trustee Company Limited 205 Hastings Street |
|
Jrmd Trustees (bg) Limited 205 Hastings Street South |
Plumbers Hb Limited Suite 1, 202 Eastbourne Street |
Clive Plumbing And Gas Fitting Limited Cnr Lyndon & Railway Roads |
Greg Jaques Plumbing & Drainage Limited Suite 1/202 Eastbourne Street West |
Wayne Gardner Plumbing Limited 507 Eastbourne Street West |
R J Plumbing & Drainage Limited 808 Cook Place |
Hastings Plumbing Limited 808 Cook Place |