Nz Mje Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041695753) was started on 15 Apr 2015. 7 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 9, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, service). 36 Selwyn Avenue, Mission Bay, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 16 Mar 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Watson, Gilbert Kim (an individual) located at Greenlane, Auckland postcode 1051,
Hunt, Jamie David (a director) located at Mission Bay, Auckland postcode 1071,
Hunt, Suzanne Colleen (an individual) located at Mission Bay, Auckland postcode 1071. "Financial asset investing" (ANZSIC K624010) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Nz Mje Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 15, 34 Shortland Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered & service | 16 Mar 2021 |
Level 9, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 | Postal & office & delivery | 18 Mar 2024 |
Level 9, 188 Quay Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 26 Mar 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jamie H.
Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 15 Apr 2015 |
Director | 15 Apr 2015 - current |
Arran Macdonald Hunt
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 20 Apr 2021 |
Director | 20 Apr 2021 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
36 Selwyn Avenue, Mission Bay, Auckland, 1071 | Physical & registered | 03 May 2018 - 16 Mar 2021 |
400 Lake Road, Takapuna, North Shore City, 0622 | Registered & physical | 15 Apr 2015 - 03 May 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Watson, Gilbert Kim Individual |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 |
08 Aug 2016 - current |
Hunt, Jamie David Director |
Mission Bay Auckland 1071 |
15 Apr 2015 - current |
Hunt, Suzanne Colleen Individual |
Mission Bay Auckland 1071 |
08 Aug 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hunt, Suzanne Colleen Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
20 Apr 2015 - 20 Apr 2015 |
Watson, Gilbert Kim Individual |
Greenlane Auckland 1051 |
20 Apr 2015 - 20 Apr 2015 |
Endow Nominees Limited 400 Lake Road |
|
Endow Limited 400 Lake Road |
|
Nh Trustees No.8 Limited 400 Lake Road |
|
Nh Trustees No.7 Limited 400 Lake Road |
|
Nh Trustees No.6 Limited 400 Lake Road |
|
Nh Trustees No.5 Limited 400 Lake Road |
Copeland Family Trustee Company Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
Mr Riley Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
Trufusion Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
Hoea Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
A & C Parkinson Investments Limited Level 1, 111 Hurstmere Road |
Swordfish Asset Management Limited 26 Park Avenue |