Anamady Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429041774878) was registered on 28 May 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 21 Neville Street, Warkworth, Warkworth, 0910 (type: registered, physical). 23 Neville Street, Warkworth, Warkworth had been their registered address, until 30 Apr 2020. 120 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 60 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Butler, Lynne Diane (a director) located at Rd 1, Warkworth postcode 0981. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 60 shares); it includes
Lund, Trevor Richard (a director) - located at Rd 1, Warkworth. "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is the classification the ABS issued to Anamady Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 12 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
21 Neville Street, Warkworth, Warkworth, 0910 | Registered & physical & service | 30 Apr 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Trevor Richard Lund
Rd 1, Warkworth, 0981
Address used since 21 Oct 2015 |
Director | 28 May 2015 - current |
Lynne Diane Butler
Rd 1, Warkworth, 0981
Address used since 21 Oct 2015 |
Director | 28 May 2015 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
23 Neville Street, Warkworth, Warkworth, 0910 | Registered & physical | 29 Mar 2018 - 30 Apr 2020 |
20 Commerce Street, Whangarei, Whangarei, 0110 | Registered & physical | 28 May 2015 - 29 Mar 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Butler, Lynne Diane Director |
Rd 1 Warkworth 0981 |
28 May 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lund, Trevor Richard Director |
Rd 1 Warkworth 0981 |
28 May 2015 - current |
Lmr Limited 23 Neville Street |
|
Townsend Brooker Limited 23 Neville Street |
|
Freemont Properties Limited 23 Neville Street |
|
Warkworth Investment Properties Limited 23 Neville Street |
|
Warkworth Surveyors Limited Withers Building, 23 Neville Street |
|
Bean Building Limited Withers Building, 23 Neville Street |
Foleo Limited Withers Building, 23 Neville Street |
Houpara Properties Limited 21 Lilburn Street |
Scott & Jody's Investments Limited 54 Whitaker Road |
Gadgets Trustee Company Limited 41 Hauiti Drive |
Sd Je Together Limited 43 Victoria Street |
Wharekoa Properties Limited 98 Pulham Road |