Ingenio H1 Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041878996) was registered on 31 Jul 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 4Th Floor Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). 4Th Floor Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 26 Apr 2018. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Preston, Stefan Gary (a director) located at Auckland Central, Auckland postcode 1010. "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040) is the category the ABS issued to Ingenio H1 Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 07 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
4th Floor Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical & service | 26 Apr 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Stefan Gary Preston
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 26 Mar 2021
Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 31 Jul 2015 |
Director | 31 Jul 2015 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4th Floor Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1010 | Physical & registered | 13 Apr 2018 - 26 Apr 2018 |
4th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1141 | Registered & physical | 28 Apr 2017 - 13 Apr 2018 |
4th Floor, Smith & Caughey Building, 253 Queen Street, Auckland, 1141 | Physical & registered | 31 Jul 2015 - 28 Apr 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Preston, Stefan Gary Director |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
27 Aug 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ingenio Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032367928 Company Number: 2214691 Entity |
253 Queen Street Auckland 1141, C/-gilligan Sheppard Ltd |
31 Jul 2015 - 27 Aug 2019 |
Ingenio Group Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032367928 Company Number: 2214691 Entity |
253 Queen Street Auckland 1141, C/-gilligan Sheppard Ltd |
31 Jul 2015 - 27 Aug 2019 |
Name | Ingenio Group Holdings Limited |
Type | Ltd |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 2214691 |
Country of origin | NZ |
Address |
Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building 253 Queen Street Auckland 1010 |
Hibiscus Marine & Storage Limited 4th Floor, 253 Queen Street |
|
Cumuli Limited Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building |
|
Hahei Limited 253 Queen Street |
|
Le Tong Trustee Limited Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building |
|
Chang Wei Trustee Limited Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building |
|
Ezy Trustee Limited Level 4, Smith & Caughey Building |
Fugio Investments Limited Level 4 |
Horoeka Limited Level 4, Bdo Centre, 4 Graham Street |
White Charger Limited Level 2, 63 Fort Street |
Kapalua Limited Level 6, 16 Viaduct Harbour Avenue |
Mackinlays Limited Level 5, 68 Shortland Street |
Redemptech Limited Level 12 17 Albert St |