New Dynamic Group Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429041880395) was launched on 31 Jul 2015. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 35 Miramar Place, Pakuranga, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 (type: registered, physical). Suite 5, 150 Symonds Street, Eden Terrace, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 15 Nov 2021. New Dynamic Group Limited used other names, namely: Hec Marketing Limited from 30 Jul 2015 to 21 Nov 2016. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Zhang, Qun (a director) located at Pakuranga, Auckland postcode 2010. "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is the classification the ABS issued New Dynamic Group Limited. Our data was last updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
35 Miramar Place, Pakuranga, Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010 | Registered & physical & service | 15 Nov 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Qun Zhang
Pakuranga, Auckland, 2010
Address used since 05 Mar 2019
New Windsor, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 05 Mar 2019
Ilam, Christchurch, 8041
Address used since 31 Jul 2015
Avondale, Auckland, 0600
Address used since 01 Dec 2016 |
Director | 31 Jul 2015 - current |
15 Mulgan Street , New Windsor , Auckland , 0600 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Suite 5, 150 Symonds Street, Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 29 Nov 2019 - 15 Nov 2021 |
15 Mulgan Street, New Windsor, Auckland, 0600 | Registered | 01 Apr 2019 - 15 Nov 2021 |
15 Mulgan Street, New Windsor, Auckland, 0600 | Physical | 13 Mar 2019 - 29 Nov 2019 |
Ground Floor, 87-93 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered | 29 Nov 2016 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Ground Floor, 87-93 Queen Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Physical | 29 Nov 2016 - 13 Mar 2019 |
48 Hare Street, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 | Registered & physical | 31 Jul 2015 - 29 Nov 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Zhang, Qun Director |
Pakuranga Auckland 2010 |
31 Jul 2015 - current |
Trust House Limited Social Club Incorporated Level 1 |
|
Cp Landmark Holdings Limited Level-7, Dingwall Building |
|
Rural Buys Limited Dingwall Building, 87 Queen Street, L5, Suite 501 |
|
Gpr Hotels Limited Unit 701, Dingwall Building |
|
Enterprise Properties Limited Level 7 |
|
J.d. Rai & Sons Limited Level 7 |
Excellent Trust Property Limited 80 Queen Street |
Wynrie Forest Limited 80 Queen Street |
Ruby City Limited 80 Queen Street |
Spirit Trustee Limited 80 Queen Street |
Lianback Limited 80 Queen Street |
S & L Enterprises Limited 1603 / 26 Albert Street |