South Canterbury Eye Clinic Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429041885390) was started on 06 Aug 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Corner Queen Street & High Street, Parkside, Timaru, 7910 (type: physical, registered). 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Health New Zealand (an other) located at 44-48 Willis Street, Wellington postcode 6011. Businesscheck's database was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Corner Queen Street & High Street, Parkside, Timaru, 7910 | Physical & registered & service | 06 Aug 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jason Leigh Power
Pleasant Point, Timaru, 7903
Address used since 12 Sep 2022 |
Director | 12 Sep 2022 - current |
Ronal Arthur Luxton
Temuka, Temuka, 7920
Address used since 26 Jan 2018 |
Director | 26 Jan 2018 - 20 May 2024 |
Paul Nicholas Annear
Marchwiel, Timaru, 7910
Address used since 31 Jan 2020 |
Director | 31 Jan 2020 - 20 May 2024 |
Raelene Elva De Joux
Rd 2, Timaru, 7972
Address used since 23 Jun 2022 |
Director | 23 Jun 2022 - 20 May 2024 |
Philip Graham Hope
Oamaru North, Oamaru, 9400
Address used since 03 Dec 2021 |
Director | 03 Dec 2021 - 23 Jun 2022 |
Mark Francis Rogers
Rd 2, Timaru, 7972
Address used since 26 Feb 2020 |
Director | 26 Feb 2020 - 03 Dec 2021 |
Donald Murray Douglas Cleverley
R D 5, Timaru, 7975
Address used since 06 Aug 2015 |
Director | 06 Aug 2015 - 26 Feb 2020 |
Murray Gordon Roberts
Gleniti, Timaru, 7910
Address used since 26 Jan 2018 |
Director | 26 Jan 2018 - 26 Feb 2020 |
Nigel Mark Trainor
R D 5, Timaru, 7975
Address used since 06 Aug 2015 |
Director | 06 Aug 2015 - 26 Jan 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Health New Zealand Other (Other) |
44-48 Willis Street Wellington 6011 |
31 Mar 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Te Whatu Ora Other |
Parkside Timaru 7910 |
06 Aug 2015 - 31 Mar 2023 |
South Canterbury Mammography Services Trust Cnr Queen Streets & High Streets |
|
South Canterbury Medical Education Trust C/o G N Dellow |
|
Bay View Trust 38 High Street |
|
The Hearing Association South Canterbury Incorporated 30 Memorial Avenue |
|
Mikzaak Investments Limited 3 Catherine Street |
|
Total Automotive 2017 Limited 11 High Street |