Riversea Trading Company Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429041892244) was launched on 10 Aug 2015. 1 address is in use by the company: Suite 2.1, 582 Karangahape Road, Auckland, 1010 (type: registered, physical). 2 Fitzroy Street, Ponsonby, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 17 Mar 2017. 120 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 60 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Pablo Lemos (a director) located at Herne Bay, Auckland postcode 1011. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (60 shares); it includes
David Kinnear (an individual) - located at Point Chevalier, Auckland. "Health food wholesaling" (ANZSIC F360925) is the classification the ABS issued to Riversea Trading Company Limited. Our information was last updated on 21 Nov 2021.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Suite 2.1, 582 Karangahape Road, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 17 Mar 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Pablo Campos De Lemos
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 22 Apr 2016 |
Director | 22 Apr 2016 - current |
David Kinnear
Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 10 Aug 2015 |
Director | 10 Aug 2015 - 23 Oct 2020 |
Theresa Kinnear
Point Chevalier, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 10 Aug 2015 |
Director | 10 Aug 2015 - 19 Oct 2020 |
Justin John Hodgson
Morningside, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 10 Aug 2015 |
Director | 10 Aug 2015 - 26 Nov 2015 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2 Fitzroy Street, Ponsonby, Auckland, 1021 | Physical & registered | 10 Aug 2015 - 17 Mar 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pablo Campos De Lemos Director |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
06 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
David Kinnear Individual |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 |
10 Aug 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Theresa Kinnear Individual |
Point Chevalier Auckland 1022 |
10 Aug 2015 - 23 Oct 2020 |
Justin John Hodgson Director |
Morningside Auckland 1022 |
10 Aug 2015 - 03 Dec 2015 |
Justin John Hodgson Individual |
Morningside Auckland 1022 |
10 Aug 2015 - 03 Dec 2015 |
Robert's Your Mother's Brother Limited Suite 2.1, 582 Karangahape Rd |
|
The Adlerian Trust 2 South Street |
|
Destiny Loggers Shop 33, Karangahape Plaza |
|
Auckland West Aquatic Sports Trust Level 2 |
|
Escape Route International Pty Ltd Suite 3, 4 Newton Road |
|
30nine Limited 6b Ponsonby Road |
The Seriously Good Foods Group Limited 29 Dacre Street |
Ministry Of Breakfast Limited 202 Karangahape Road |
Aulando NZ Limited 116 Symonds Street |
Nom Nom Nosh Limited 16 Cooper Street |
Paleo Nutrition Limited 38 Elgin Street |
Syl (nz) International Company Limited 86 Symonds Street |