Fourie Trustee Limited (NZBN 9429041940693) was started on 25 Aug 2015. 1 address is in use by the company: 85 Boundary Road, Claudelands, Hamilton, 3214 (type: physical, registered). Suite 1, 46 Lake Road, Northcote, Auckland had been their registered address, until 21 Jun 2017. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Jacobus Andries (an individual) located at Rd 1, Ohaupo postcode 3881,
Jacobus Andries (a director) located at Rd 1, Ohaupo postcode 3881. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Kevin Booth (a director) - located at Claudelands, Hamilton. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Fourie Trustee Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 05 Jun 2020.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
85 Boundary Road, Claudelands, Hamilton, 3214 | Physical & registered | 21 Jun 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kevin Ashley Booth
Claudelands, Hamilton, 3214
Address used since 08 Aug 2018 |
Director | 08 Aug 2018 - current |
Willie Pienaar Piso
Huntington, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 25 Aug 2015 |
Director | 25 Aug 2015 - 17 Aug 2018 |
Jacobus Fourie Andries
Rd 1, Ohaupo, 3881
Address used since 25 Aug 2015 |
Director | 25 Aug 2015 - 16 May 2018 |
85 Boundary Road , Claudelands , Hamilton , 3214 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Suite 1, 46 Lake Road, Northcote, Auckland, 0627 | Registered & physical | 25 Aug 2015 - 21 Jun 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jacobus Fourie Andries Individual |
Rd 1 Ohaupo 3881 |
25 Aug 2015 - current |
Jacobus Fourie Andries Director |
Rd 1 Ohaupo 3881 |
25 Aug 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kevin Ashley Booth Director |
Claudelands Hamilton 3214 |
17 Aug 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Willie Pienaar Piso Individual |
Huntington Hamilton 3210 |
25 Aug 2015 - 17 Aug 2018 |
Hamilton Law Limited 85 Boundary Road |
|
Sportpix Limited 85 Boundary Road |
|
Hamilton Parents Centre Incorporated 87 Boundary Road |
|
Allanscapes Limited 79a Boundary Road |
|
Green Leaf Limited 77a Boundary Road |
|
Totara Holdings (2008) Limited 77a Boundary Road |
Emerald Trustee (2013) Limited 73a Boundary Road |
Astute Trustees Limited 73a Boundary Road |
Kainos Property Limited 1 Alfred Street |
The Oaks Trustee Company Limited 1 Alfred Street |
Bsix13 Trustee Company Limited 19 Stanley Street |
Lancaster Investment Trustees Limited 253a River Road |