Ewok Investments Limited (issued a business number of 9429041976470) was launched on 14 Sep 2015. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 36 Stafford Rise, Owhata, Rotorua, 3010 (type: postal, office). 5 Bradley Place, Lynmore, Rotorua had been their physical address, until 06 Mar 2019. Ewok Investments Limited used more aliases, namely: Rural Financial Solutions Limited from 14 Sep 2015 to 03 Aug 2022. 120 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 120 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Hoggard, Chad Jeremy (a director) located at Owhata, Rotorua postcode 3010. "Investment - financial assets" (ANZSIC K624040) is the category the ABS issued to Ewok Investments Limited. Our data was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
36 Stafford Rise, Owhata, Rotorua, 3010 | Registered | 09 Mar 2018 |
36 Stafford Rise, Owhata, Rotorua, 3010 | Physical & service | 06 Mar 2019 |
36 Stafford Rise, Owhata, Rotorua, 3010 | Postal & office & delivery | 09 Mar 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Chad Jeremy Hoggard
Lynmore, Rotorua, 3010
Address used since 14 Sep 2015
Owhata, Rotorua, 3010
Address used since 01 Mar 2018 |
Director | 14 Sep 2015 - current |
36 Stafford Rise , Owhata , Rotorua , 3010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
5 Bradley Place, Lynmore, Rotorua, 3010 | Physical | 21 Mar 2016 - 06 Mar 2019 |
5 Bradley Place, Lynmore, Rotorua, 3010 | Registered | 21 Mar 2016 - 09 Mar 2018 |
1248 Tutanekai Street, Rotorua, 3010 | Physical & registered | 14 Sep 2015 - 21 Mar 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hoggard, Chad Jeremy Director |
Owhata Rotorua 3010 |
14 Sep 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wilson, Stuart Barrie Individual |
Lynmore Rotorua 3010 |
14 Sep 2015 - 18 Feb 2016 |
Bbecs Limited 6 Bradley Place |
|
Geomatic Surveys Limited 8 Bradley Place |
|
Merle Tex International Limited 37 Blackmore Drive |
|
Scicon Scientific Consultants Limited 8 Link Road |
|
K2rj Investments Limited 108 Iles Road |
|
Steel Design Engineering Limited 4 Mark Place |
Koutu Investments Limited 13 Coulter Road |
Rubyrose Investments Limited 367a Old Taupo Road |
Forward Vision Investments Limited 27 Dekker Road |
Shalfoon Investments Limited 153 Jellicoe Street |
Murray Davies Trustees Limited 170 Keenan Road |
Dyer Gold Company Limited 45-49 Tirau Street |