Tapu Holdings Limited (NZBN 9429041979013) was incorporated on 16 Sep 2015. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 95B Kohimarama Rd, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: registered, physical). Flat 301, 100 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland had been their registered address, until 14 Aug 2018. Tapu Holdings Limited used other names, namely: Rama Trustees Limited from 15 Sep 2015 to 31 Aug 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 98 shares (98 per cent of shares), namely:
Apex Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Kohimarama, Auckland postcode 1071. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 2 per cent of all shares (exactly 2 shares); it includes
Watson, Thomas Simpson (a director) - located at Kohimarama, Auckland. Businesscheck's data was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
95b Kohimarama Rd, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Aug 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomas Simpson Watson
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 08 Aug 2017 |
Director | 16 Sep 2015 - current |
Raewyn Mary Bradley
Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 16 Sep 2015 |
Director | 16 Sep 2015 - 17 Aug 2016 |
Maurice Desmond Bradley
Ohauiti, Tauranga, 3112
Address used since 16 Sep 2015 |
Director | 16 Sep 2015 - 01 Jun 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 301, 100 Parnell Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & physical | 16 Sep 2015 - 14 Aug 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Apex Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036395477 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
29 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Watson, Thomas Simpson Director |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
17 Aug 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Watfor Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036583874 Company Number: 1195938 Entity |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
29 Sep 2016 - 11 Aug 2020 |
Bradley, Maurice Desmond Individual |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 |
16 Sep 2015 - 17 Aug 2016 |
Watfor Investments Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036583874 Company Number: 1195938 Entity |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
29 Sep 2016 - 11 Aug 2020 |
Maurice Desmond Bradley Director |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 |
16 Sep 2015 - 17 Aug 2016 |
Raewyn Mary Bradley Director |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 |
16 Sep 2015 - 17 Aug 2016 |
Bradley, Raewyn Mary Individual |
Ohauiti Tauranga 3112 |
16 Sep 2015 - 17 Aug 2016 |
End 2 End Limited 205/100 Parnell Road |
|
Lochiel Farmlands Limited Geyser |
|
Sterling Nominees Limited Geyser |
|
Samson Corporation Limited Geyser |
|
W Investments Limited Geyser |
|
Hotondo Homes New Zealand Limited Ground Floor, 92 Parnell Road |