Little Wheels Northland Limited (issued a business number of 9429042123439) was launched on 18 Dec 2015. 1 address is in use by the company: Level 4/35 Robert Street, Whangarei, 0140 (type: physical, registered). 1A Douglas Street, Kensington, Whangarei had been their physical address, up to 07 Mar 2018. 1200 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.08% of shares), namely:
Malanie Dalgleish (an individual) located at Whangarei, Whangarei postcode 0110. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.08% of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Alexander Dalgleish (an individual) - located at Whangarei, Whangarei. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allocation (598 shares, 49.83%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Dalgleish Trustees Limited, located at Whangarei (an entity),
Alexander Dalgleish, located at Whangarei, Whangarei (an individual),
Malanie Dalgleish, located at Whangarei, Whangarei (an individual). "Recreational activity nec" (ANZSIC R913977) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Little Wheels Northland Limited. Our information was updated on 04 Feb 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4/35 Robert Street, Whangarei, 0140 | Physical & registered | 07 Mar 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Graham Paton
Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 18 Dec 2015 |
Director | 18 Dec 2015 - current |
Alexander Thomas Dalgleish
Whangarei, Whangarei, 0110
Address used since 27 Apr 2016 |
Director | 27 Apr 2016 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1a Douglas Street, Kensington, Whangarei, 0112 | Physical & registered | 05 Oct 2016 - 07 Mar 2018 |
156 Bank Street, Regent, Whangarei, 0112 | Registered & physical | 18 Dec 2015 - 05 Oct 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Malanie Ann Dalgleish Individual |
Whangarei Whangarei 0110 |
29 Apr 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexander Thomas Dalgleish Individual |
Whangarei Whangarei 0110 |
29 Apr 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dalgleish Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041756508 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whangarei 0110 |
29 Apr 2016 - current |
Alexander Thomas Dalgleish Individual |
Whangarei Whangarei 0110 |
29 Apr 2016 - current |
Malanie Ann Dalgleish Individual |
Whangarei Whangarei 0110 |
29 Apr 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Graham Paton Director |
Whangarei 0110 |
18 Dec 2015 - current |
Johnny Wray Cafe Limited Level 4 35 Robert Street |
|
Jmr Trustee Limited Level 1, 5 Hunt Street |
|
Winger Investments Limited Level 4, 35 Robert Street |
|
Bradley Nuttall North Limited Level 2, 96 Bank Street |
|
Jonda Enterprises Contracting Limited Level 1, 4 Vinery Lane |
|
Pete Brown Builder Limited Level 1, 4 Vinery Lane |
Ohuatahi Initiatives Limited 8 Morningside Road |
Gillco22 Limited 211 Whangarei Heads Road |
Adam Hyde Limited 8 Garden Court |
Bay Of Islands Rock Cruises Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
Flying Kiwi Parasail Limited 10 Fairway Drive |
Tecni-sport Limited 12 Elizabeth Street |