Gilbert Haymes & Associates 2016 Limited (NZBN 9429042126652) was registered on 27 Jan 2016. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 181 High Street, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201 (type: delivery, postal). 1 Hutcheson Street, Mayfield, Blenheim had been their registered address, up to 08 Apr 2020. 300 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 200 shares (66.67 per cent of shares), namely:
Morton, Philip John (a director) located at Witherlea, Blenheim postcode 7201. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33 per cent of all shares (exactly 100 shares); it includes
Mcmillan, Grant Murray (an individual) - located at Blenheim, Blenheim. "Surveying service" (ANZSIC M692290) is the classification the ABS issued Gilbert Haymes & Associates 2016 Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 11 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
181 High Street, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201 | Office | 04 Sep 2019 |
Level 2, Youell House, 1 Hutcheson Street, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered & physical & service | 08 Apr 2020 |
181 High Street, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201 | Delivery | 04 Aug 2020 |
P O Box 380, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7240 | Postal | 04 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip John Morton
Witherlea, Blenheim, 7201
Address used since 27 Jan 2016 |
Director | 27 Jan 2016 - current |
Grant Murray Mcmillan
Blenheim, Blenheim, 7201
Address used since 01 Apr 2021 |
Director | 01 Apr 2021 - current |
Anthony John Hawke
Rd 2, Blenheim, 7272
Address used since 27 Jan 2016 |
Director | 27 Jan 2016 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Perry Mason Gilbert
Witherlea, Blenheim, 7201
Address used since 27 Jan 2016 |
Director | 27 Jan 2016 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
P O Box 380, Blenheim, Blenheim, 7240 | Postal | 04 Aug 2020 |
181 High Street , Blenheim , Blenheim , 7201 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1 Hutcheson Street, Mayfield, Blenheim, 7201 | Registered & physical | 27 Jan 2016 - 08 Apr 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Morton, Philip John Director |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 |
27 Jan 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mcmillan, Grant Murray Individual |
Blenheim Blenheim 7201 |
31 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gilbert, Stephanie Mary Individual |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 |
06 Jul 2016 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Anthony John Hawke And Phillippa Agnes Hawke As Trustees Of The Weld Cone Trust Other |
Rd 2 Blenheim 7272 |
05 Aug 2016 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Hawke, Anthony John Individual |
Rd 2 Blenheim 7272 |
27 Jan 2016 - 05 Aug 2016 |
Gilbert, Perry Mason Individual |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 |
27 Jan 2016 - 06 Jul 2016 |
Gilbert, Stephanie Mary Individual |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 |
06 Jul 2016 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Anthony John Hawke And Phillippa Agnes Hawke As Trustees Of The Weld Cone Trust Other |
Rd 2 Blenheim 7272 |
05 Aug 2016 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Anthony John Hawke And Phillippa Agnes Hawke As Trustees Of The Weld Cone Trust Other |
Rd 2 Blenheim 7272 |
05 Aug 2016 - 01 Apr 2022 |
Perry Mason Gilbert, Stephanie Mary Gilbert And Dew And Company Trustee Services Limited Other |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 |
06 Jul 2016 - 07 Apr 2021 |
Perry Mason Gilbert, Stephanie Mary Gilbert And Dew And Company Trustee Services Limited Other |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 |
06 Jul 2016 - 07 Apr 2021 |
Perry Mason Gilbert Director |
Witherlea Blenheim 7201 |
27 Jan 2016 - 06 Jul 2016 |
Anthony John Hawke Director |
Rd 2 Blenheim 7272 |
27 Jan 2016 - 05 Aug 2016 |
Longfin Limited Level 2, Youell House, |
|
Faux-jumeaux Holdings Limited Level 2, Youell House |
|
Premier Painting Limited Level 2, Youell House |
|
Hawkesbury Heights Limited Level 2, Youell House |
|
Toroa Consulting Limited Level 2, Youell House |
|
Albatross Backpackers (2010) Limited Level 2, Youell House |
Newton & Associates Limited 44 Oxford Street |
Urban Jungle Adventures Limited 6 Ruahine Street |
New Zealand Surveyors Limited 106b Ironside Road |
Tasman Gowland Surveyors Limited 29 Wallace Street |
Fins Services Limited 8b Riverstone Drive |
Land Matters Limited 20 Addington Road |