Xanadu Trustee Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429042259138) was registered on 24 Mar 2016. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 5 William Laurie Place, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (type: registered, physical). 5 William Laurie Place, Albany, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 29 Apr 2021. 100 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Yee, Edward Shouen (a director) located at Forrest Hill, Auckland postcode 0620. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Yee, Raewyn (a director) - located at Forrest Hill, Auckland. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Xanadu Trustee Limited. Our information was updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 5 William Laurie Place, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical & service | 29 Apr 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Raewyn Yee
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 24 Mar 2016 |
Director | 24 Mar 2016 - current |
Edward Shouen Yee
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 24 Mar 2016 |
Director | 24 Mar 2016 - current |
5 William Laurie Place , Albany , Auckland , 0632 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
5 William Laurie Place, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Physical | 02 Mar 2021 - 29 Apr 2021 |
5 William Laurie Place, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered | 14 Feb 2020 - 29 Apr 2021 |
32 Woodstock Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Physical | 10 Oct 2016 - 02 Mar 2021 |
32 Woodstock Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Registered | 10 Oct 2016 - 14 Feb 2020 |
52 Woodstock Road, Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620 | Physical & registered | 24 Mar 2016 - 10 Oct 2016 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yee, Edward Shouen Director |
Forrest Hill Auckland 0620 |
24 Mar 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Yee, Raewyn Director |
Forrest Hill Auckland 0620 |
24 Mar 2016 - current |
Tfb 2005 Developments Limited 44 Manutara Avenue |
|
D.j's Corporate Trustee Limited 31 Woodstock Road |
|
Totara Vale Limited 10a Rosemary Avenue |
|
Ranphen Limited 4 Woodstock Road |
|
Triple-ten Seventy Limited 59 Blakeborough Drive |
|
Smuts Family Trustee Limited 59 Blakeborough Drive |
Silviafan Trustee Limited 3/34 Sunnynook Road |
Miramar Trustee Limited 13a William Souter Street |
Vorst Limited 7 Varlene Terrace |
Cui & Li Family Trustee Limited 27 Trinidad Road |
L & C Trustee Co Limited 10 Jonathan Place |
Rothery Trustees Limited 10 Springfield Street |