Blizzard Limited (issued a business number of 9429042261728) was launched on 29 Mar 2016. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 8A Jepsen Grove, Wallaceville, Upper Hutt, 5018 (type: postal, office). 4 Citrine Grove, Timberlea, Upper Hutt had been their registered address, up until 29 Sep 2023. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Visionex Group Limited (an entity) located at Tawa, Wellington postcode 5028. "Electrical services" (ANZSIC E323220) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Blizzard Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
16 Sandford Street, Trentham, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 19 May 2017 |
4 Citrine Grove, Timberlea, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Physical | 20 Aug 2021 |
8a Jepsen Grove, Wallaceville, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Registered & service | 29 Sep 2023 |
8a Jepsen Grove, Wallaceville, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Postal & office | 14 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Jesse Parsons
Timberlea, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 12 Aug 2021
Trentham, Upper Hutt, 5018
Address used since 19 May 2017 |
Director | 29 Mar 2016 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
8a Jepsen Grove, Wallaceville, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Postal & office | 14 Nov 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4 Citrine Grove, Timberlea, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Registered & service | 20 Aug 2021 - 29 Sep 2023 |
16 Sandford Street, Trentham, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Registered & physical | 12 Mar 2021 - 20 Aug 2021 |
Level 1, 8 Margaret Street, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered & physical | 08 May 2018 - 12 Mar 2021 |
16 Sandford Street, Trentham, Upper Hutt, 5018 | Registered & physical | 29 May 2017 - 08 May 2018 |
2 Bellringer Crescent, Newlands, Wellington, 6037 | Physical & registered | 29 Mar 2016 - 29 May 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Visionex Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051435523 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tawa Wellington 5028 |
21 Sep 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Parsons, Jesse Director |
Timberlea Upper Hutt 5018 |
29 Mar 2016 - 21 Sep 2023 |
Md Caterers Limited 533 Fergusson Drive |
|
My Sparky Limited 10 Ngata Grove |
|
Galaxy Store Limited 520 Fergusson Drive |
|
Proveg Wholesalers Limited 3 Liverpool Street |
|
Modcase International Limited 1 Ngata Grove |
|
Mediavision International Limited 1 Ngata Grove |
My Sparky Limited 10 Ngata Grove |
Mike Pye Electrical Limited 3 Betty Watt Grove |
On-q Electrical Limited 27 Cosgrove Rise |
Maathuis Electrical Limited 7d Gibbons Street |
Gators Electrical & Heatpumps Limited 15 Mcleod Street |
Collins Electrical Limited 31 Montgomery Crescent |