Mandarin Brothers Limited (NZBN 9429042493860) was incorporated on 01 Aug 2016. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 22 Stranraer Crescent, Wattle Downs, Auckland, 2103 (type: registered, physical). 2/112 New Windsor Road, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 25 May 2021. Mandarin Brothers Limited used other names, namely: Federal Clean Limited from 01 Aug 2016 to 02 Aug 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Li, Tianjiao (an individual) located at Wattle Downs, Auckland postcode 2103. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Li, Peng (a director) - located at Wattle Downs, Auckland. "Electrical services" (business classification E323220) is the category the ABS issued to Mandarin Brothers Limited. The Businesscheck data was last updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
22 Stranraer Crescent, Wattle Downs, Auckland, 2103 | Registered & physical & service | 25 May 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Peng Li
Wattle Downs, Auckland, 2103
Address used since 05 Oct 2021
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 01 Aug 2016 |
Director | 01 Aug 2016 - current |
Benjamin Li
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 01 Aug 2016 |
Director | 01 Aug 2016 - current |
2/112 New Windsor Road , Auckland Central , Auckland , 0600 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2/112 New Windsor Road, Auckland, 0600 | Physical & registered | 27 Jan 2020 - 25 May 2021 |
Flat122, 2 Dockside Lane, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 28 Jun 2019 - 27 Jan 2020 |
Flat 2, 112 New Windsor Road, New Windsor, Auckland, 0600 | Registered & physical | 09 May 2019 - 28 Jun 2019 |
15/39 Onehunga Mall, Onehunga, Auckland, 1061 | Registered & physical | 29 Jan 2019 - 09 May 2019 |
Flat 122, 2 Dockside Lane, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 01 Aug 2016 - 29 Jan 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Li, Tianjiao Individual |
Wattle Downs Auckland 2103 |
09 Feb 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Li, Peng Director |
Wattle Downs Auckland 2103 |
24 Mar 2020 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Li, Peng Director |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
01 Aug 2016 - 20 Jun 2019 |
Li, Peng Director |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
01 Aug 2016 - 20 Jun 2019 |
Golden Flower Limited 4b Dockside Lane |
|
Tcl Holdings Limited 11 Dockside Lane |
|
180 Holdings Limited 11 Dockside Lane |
|
Cloud Computing Continuation Services Limited 11 Dockside Lane |
|
Custom Fleet Nz 8 Tangihua Street |
|
Efn Fleet NZ Limited 8 Tangihua Street |
Activ8 Group Limited Level 2 |
Aws Trading Limited Level 2 |
Activ8 Electrical Limited Level 2 |
Powerall Electrical Limited 60-64 Upper Queen St |
Novatech Limited Level 1 |
Arc-rite Electrical Services Limited 10 Heather Street |