Johnston's Coachlines (Nz) Limited (NZBN 9429042504108) was started on 08 Aug 2016. 8 addresess are in use by the company: 110 Halsey Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 (type: service, office). 57 Higgins Road, Frankton, Hamilton had been their registered address, up until 15 Nov 2018. 1000 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Go-Bus Holdings Limited (an entity) located at Hamilton Central, Hamilton postcode 3204. "Bus, coach transport - long distance" (ANZSIC I462110) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Johnston's Coachlines (Nz) Limited. Our data was updated on 06 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
12 Penihana Place, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Physical & service | 15 Nov 2018 |
Level 2 678 Victoria Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered | 15 Nov 2018 |
Level 2 678 Victoria Street, Hamilton, 3204 | Postal & office | 20 Nov 2019 |
12 Penihana Place, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Delivery | 20 Nov 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Calum Andrew Haslop
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 08 Aug 2016 |
Director | 08 Aug 2016 - current |
Michael Edward Sewards
Southbank, Vic, 3006
Address used since 11 Jan 2024
Melbourne, Victoria, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Melbourne Airport, Victoria, 3045
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Sandringham, Victoria, 3191
Address used since 04 Aug 2020 |
Director | 04 Aug 2020 - current |
Adam Gordon Begg
Melbourne, Victoria, 3000
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Balaclava, Victoria, 3183
Address used since 13 Jul 2022
Melbourne Airport, Victoria, 3045
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Elsternwick, Victoria, 3185
Address used since 04 Aug 2020 |
Director | 04 Aug 2020 - current |
Mark Dean Gerbich
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 08 Aug 2016 |
Director | 08 Aug 2016 - 04 Aug 2020 |
Dallas Brent Fisher
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 08 Aug 2016 |
Director | 08 Aug 2016 - 04 Aug 2020 |
Michael Nicholas Allen
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 21 Feb 2017 |
Director | 21 Feb 2017 - 04 Aug 2020 |
Andre Lyndon Settle
Rototuna, Hamilton, 3210
Address used since 24 Feb 2017 |
Director | 24 Feb 2017 - 04 Aug 2020 |
Samuel Burns Watson Inglis
Merivale, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 27 Mar 2020 |
Director | 27 Mar 2020 - 04 Aug 2020 |
Michael Eric Pohio
Frankton, Hamilton, 3204
Address used since 27 Mar 2020 |
Director | 27 Mar 2020 - 04 Aug 2020 |
Michael Sang
Ilam, Christchurch, 8041
Address used since 08 Aug 2016 |
Director | 08 Aug 2016 - 27 Mar 2020 |
James Gerard Quinn
Greenhithe, Auckland, 0632
Address used since 10 Oct 2016 |
Director | 10 Oct 2016 - 27 Mar 2020 |
Craig Duncan Stephen
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 08 Aug 2016 |
Director | 08 Aug 2016 - 22 Feb 2017 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
12 Penihana Place, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Delivery | 20 Nov 2019 |
64 Westney Road, Mangere, Auckland, 2022 | Office & delivery | 15 Nov 2023 |
110 Halsey Street, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Service | 23 Nov 2023 |
Level 2 678 Victoria Street , Hamilton , 3204 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
57 Higgins Road, Frankton, Hamilton, 3204 | Registered & physical | 08 Aug 2016 - 15 Nov 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Go-bus Holdings Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429033070490 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton Central Hamilton 3204 |
08 Aug 2016 - current |
Effective Date | 31 Jul 2022 |
Name | Kinetic Tco Pty Limited |
Type | Company |
Ultimate Holding Company Number | 601251067 |
Country of origin | AU |
Address |
Level 2, Victoria Street Hamilton 3204 |
Hale Health Centre Limited 57 Higgins Road |
|
Te Runanga O Kirikiriroa Charitable Trust 59 Higgins Road |
|
Artiflax Limited 44 Higgins Road |
|
Haynes Investments Limited 36a Higgins Road |
|
Creative Plastic Fabrication Limited 35 Higgins Road |
|
Dud-lee Enterprises Limited 61 Higgins Road |
Town & Country Touring Limited 398 Oturoa Road |
Silvermoon Tours Limited 95 Mt Lebanon Crescent |
Tairua Bus Company Limited 31 Leeward Dr |
Crystal Travel And Transport Limited 29 Fordyce Avenue |
Spring Wind Tours Limited 371 Bucklands Beach Road |
Lnz Coachlines Limited 107 Halsey Drive |