Mavrow Trustee Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429042523420) was launched on 18 Aug 2016. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 5 William Laurie Place, Albany, Auckland, 0632 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, 5 William Laurie Place, Albany, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 23 Apr 2021. 168 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 56 shares (33.33 per cent of shares), namely:
Travis, Scott Dean (a director) located at Manly, Whangaparaoa postcode 0930. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.33 per cent of all shares (exactly 56 shares); it includes
Dean, Joseph Richard Tristan (a director) - located at Tindalls Beach, Whangaparaoa. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (56 shares, 33.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Watkins Barlow, Philip John, located at Northcote, Auckland (a director). "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the category the ABS issued Mavrow Trustee Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 5 William Laurie Place, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & physical & service | 23 Apr 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Scott Dean Travis
Manly, Whangaparaoa, 0930
Address used since 18 Aug 2016 |
Director | 18 Aug 2016 - current |
Joseph Richard Tristan Dean
Tindalls Beach, Whangaparaoa, 0930
Address used since 29 Aug 2017
Manly, Whangaparaoa, 0930
Address used since 18 Aug 2016 |
Director | 18 Aug 2016 - current |
Philip John Watkins Barlow
Northcote, Auckland, 0627
Address used since 29 Aug 2016 |
Director | 29 Aug 2016 - current |
Amanda Maree Billington
Mairangi Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 25 Aug 2020 |
Director | 25 Aug 2020 - current |
Brendon Paul Cutler
Forrest Hill, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 18 Aug 2016 |
Director | 18 Aug 2016 - 26 May 2020 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 5 William Laurie Place, Albany, Auckland, 0632 | Physical & registered | 18 Aug 2016 - 23 Apr 2021 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Travis, Scott Dean Director |
Manly Whangaparaoa 0930 |
18 Aug 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dean, Joseph Richard Tristan Director |
Tindalls Beach Whangaparaoa 0930 |
18 Aug 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Watkins Barlow, Philip John Director |
Northcote Auckland 0627 |
02 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cutler, Brendon Paul Individual |
Forrest Hill Auckland 0620 |
18 Aug 2016 - 29 Jun 2020 |
Zesty Design Limited Level 1, G1, 75 Corinthian Drive |
|
Allis Business Trustee Limited 331 Rosedale Road, Building 2, Level 1 |
|
Jazz Software Limited Level 1, 17c Corinthian Drive |
|
Wvft Trustees Limited Level 1, 17c Corinthian Drive |
|
Wvbt Trustees Limited Level 1,17c Corinthian Drive |
|
Ploc Properties Limited Level 1, 17c Corinthian Drive, |
Allis Business Trustee Limited 331 Rosedale Road, Building 2, Level 1 |
Dht (2016) 5 Limited 331 Rosedale Road, Building 2, Level 1 |
Dht (2016) 6 Limited 331 Rosedale Road, Building 2, Level 1 |
Dht (2017) 7 Limited 331 Rosedale Road, Building 2, Level 1 |
Mej Trustee Services No 3 Limited Apollo Accounting, 222 State Highway 17 |
Black Lab Trustee Limited 222 Dairy Flat Highway |