Heads Up Clothing & Design Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429043326822) was registered on 19 Sep 2016. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 2/1C Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai, 0505 (type: physical, service). Shop 9, Unit 9, 6 Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai had been their physical address, until 10 Jul 2019. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 49 shares (49 per cent of shares), namely:
Cuddy, Lorna Anne (a director) located at Mangawhai Heads, Mangawhai postcode 0505. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 51 per cent of all shares (exactly 51 shares); it includes
Cuddy, Ronald Bruce (a director) - located at Mangawhai Heads, Mangawhai. "Design services nec" (ANZSIC M692435) is the classification the ABS issued Heads Up Clothing & Design Limited. Our information was updated on 09 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2/1c Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai, 0505 | Physical & service & registered | 10 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ronald Bruce Cuddy
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 19 Sep 2016
Mangawhai Heads, Mangawhai, 0505
Address used since 24 Aug 2017 |
Director | 19 Sep 2016 - current |
Lorna Anne Cuddy
Parnell, Auckland, 1052
Address used since 19 Sep 2016
Mangawhai Heads, Mangawhai, 0505
Address used since 24 Aug 2017 |
Director | 19 Sep 2016 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Shop 9, Unit 9, 6 Molesworth Drive, Mangawhai, 0540 | Physical & registered | 01 Sep 2017 - 10 Jul 2019 |
1 Awatea Street, Mangawhai Heads, Mangawhai, 0505 | Registered | 19 Sep 2016 - 01 Sep 2017 |
Flat 3, 22 Gladstone Road, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical | 19 Sep 2016 - 01 Sep 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cuddy, Lorna Anne Director |
Mangawhai Heads Mangawhai 0505 |
19 Sep 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cuddy, Ronald Bruce Director |
Mangawhai Heads Mangawhai 0505 |
19 Sep 2016 - current |
Kim Munro Design Limited 19 Molesworth Drive |
|
Jv Limited 12 Pearson Street |
|
Frog And Kiwi Limited 1/6 Molesworth Drive |
|
Ak Concrete Polishers Limited 22 Pearson Street |
|
Five Dogs Holdings Limited 44 Moir Street |
|
Bennetts Of Mangawhai Investment Limited 52 Moir Street |
Oh Gosh Limited 16 Kahu Drive |
Blue Sahara Gardens Limited 401 Oneriri Road |
Nomad Trading Company Limited 22 School Road |
Bali Hacienda Limited 292 Point Wells Road |
Black Tortoise Limited 15b Rivendell Place |
Alchemy Sculptures Limited 8 Twin Stream Road |