Xtravel Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429043370054) was started on 01 Nov 2016. 5 addresess are in use by the company: A1-01, 19 Grant Road, Frankton, 9371 (type: service, registered). Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland had been their registered address, until 16 Feb 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Davies, Nicola Sheree (a director) located at Kelvin Heights, Queenstown postcode 9300. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Keating, Victoria Jane (a director) - located at Rd 3, Lumsden. "Travel agency service" (business classification N722060) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Xtravel Limited. Our data was updated on 06 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Mountain Club, Level 3 Craigs Investment Building, 36 Grant Road, Five Mile, Queenstown, 9371 | Postal & office | 15 Nov 2019 |
Level 3, Mountain Club, 36 Grant Road, Frankton, 9371 | Registered & physical & service | 16 Feb 2021 |
A1-01, 19 Grant Road, Frankton, 9371 | Service | 24 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicola Sheree Davies
Kelvin Heights, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 01 Nov 2016 |
Director | 01 Nov 2016 - current |
Victoria Jane Keating
Rd 3, Lumsden, 9793
Address used since 01 Nov 2016 |
Director | 01 Nov 2016 - current |
Mountain Club, Level 3 Craigs Investment Building , 36 Grant Road, Five Mile , Queenstown , 9371 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 26 Crummer Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021 | Registered & physical | 08 Jun 2018 - 16 Feb 2021 |
5 Holly Court, Kelvin Heights, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical | 01 Nov 2016 - 08 Jun 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Davies, Nicola Sheree Director |
Kelvin Heights Queenstown 9300 |
01 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Keating, Victoria Jane Director |
Rd 3 Lumsden 9793 |
01 Nov 2016 - current |
Hydroflow Distributors Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Baumatic Appliances Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Irontide Marine Contracting Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Construction Project Management Consultancy Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Streets Ahead Property Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
|
Jones Family Investments Limited Level 1, 26 Crummer Road |
We Love Travel Limited 41 Surrey Crescent |
Pure Traveller NZ Limited Level 3, 16 College Hill |
Fuzion Travel Limited Suite 1, Floor 1 93 Dominion Road |
Total Travel Limited Suite 1, Floor 1, 93 Dominion Road |
Cost Saver Tours Limited 131 New North Road |
Ttal Limited 9-11 Galatos Street |