Master Nz Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429045359743) was registered on 18 Nov 2016. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 27 Wilding Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, registered). 27A Wilding Avenue, Epsom, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 14 Jul 2017. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Lo, Ka Chun (a director) located at Epsom, Auckland postcode 1023. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Ho, Wing Man (an individual) - located at Epsom, Auckland. "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is the category the ABS issued to Master Nz Limited. Our information was last updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
27 Wilding Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered & service | 14 Jul 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Ka Chun Lo
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 18 Nov 2016
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 19 Jun 2017 |
Director | 18 Nov 2016 - current |
Wing Man Ho
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 18 Nov 2016 |
Director | 18 Nov 2016 - 20 Nov 2016 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
27a Wilding Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 27 Jun 2017 - 14 Jul 2017 |
27 Wilding Avenue, Epsom, Auckland, 1023 | Registered & physical | 18 Nov 2016 - 27 Jun 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lo, Ka Chun Director |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
18 Nov 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ho, Wing Man Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
19 Jun 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ho, Man Wing Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
19 Jun 2017 - 19 Jun 2017 |
Ho, Wing Man Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
18 Nov 2016 - 20 Nov 2016 |
Wing Man Ho Director |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
18 Nov 2016 - 20 Nov 2016 |
Lo, Ka Fai Individual |
Epsom Auckland 1023 |
18 Jun 2018 - 28 Mar 2019 |
Easy NZ Limited 27 Wilding Avenue |
|
Crystal Clear Marketing Limited 29 Wilding Avenue |
|
Brett And Virginia Trustees Limited 21c Wilding Avenue |
|
Knn Company Limited 35 Wilding Avenue |
|
Keshi Enterprises Limited 21 Wilding Avenue |
|
Flagship Consultants (nz) Limited 15 Wilding Avenue |
Growingfund Investment Limited Level 1, 169 Manukau Road |
Berry Family Company Limited Level 2, 4 Boston Road |
Pop Enterprises Limited Level 3, 24 Manukau Rd |
A & L Hall Investments Limited Level 4, 135 Broadway |
Icl Investments Limited Level 4, 135 Broadway |
Lugano Investments (nz) Limited Level 2, 4 Boston Road |