Merlogg Trustees Limited (NZBN 9429045852329) was started on 29 Nov 2016. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 125 Ladies Mile, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 (type: registered, physical). 1A St Vincent Avenue, Remuera, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 07 Mar 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Appleby, John Walter (a director) located at Ellerslie, Auckland postcode 1051. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Merlogg Trustees Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Po Box 11339, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1542 | Postal | 09 Feb 2021 |
125 Ladies Mile, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 | Office | 09 Feb 2021 |
125 Ladies Mile, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1050 | Delivery | 09 Feb 2021 |
125 Ladies Mile, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Mar 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Walter Appleby
Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 29 Nov 2016 |
Director | 29 Nov 2016 - current |
Kate Amos
Rd 4, Cambridge, 3496
Address used since 22 Mar 2021 |
Director | 22 Mar 2021 - 18 May 2021 |
Arnold John Smith
Onehunga, Auckland, 1061
Address used since 29 Nov 2016 |
Director | 29 Nov 2016 - 05 Jan 2017 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
125 Ladies Mile, Ellerslie, Auckland, 1051 | Registered & physical & service | 07 Mar 2022 |
125 Ladies Mile , Ellerslie , Auckland , 1051 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1a St Vincent Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Physical & registered | 29 Nov 2016 - 07 Mar 2022 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Appleby, John Walter Director |
Ellerslie Auckland 1051 |
09 Feb 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smith, Arnold John Individual |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 |
29 Nov 2016 - 02 Mar 2017 |
Ladbrooks Solicitors Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036497447 Company Number: 1210264 Entity |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
29 Nov 2016 - 09 Feb 2021 |
Ladbrooks Solicitors Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036497447 Company Number: 1210264 Entity |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
29 Nov 2016 - 09 Feb 2021 |
Arnold John Smith Director |
Onehunga Auckland 1061 |
29 Nov 2016 - 02 Mar 2017 |
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (204471) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
|
City Residences Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
|
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (178477) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
|
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (202473) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
|
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (111492) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
|
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (199896) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (197308) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (s198708) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (102641) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (175940) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (191996) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |
Wilson Mckay Trustee Company (125059(1)) Limited 1a St Vincent Avenue |