Srhb Tax Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429045858314) was started on 05 Dec 2016. 1 address is in use by the company: 205 Hastings Street South, Hastings, 4122 (type: physical, registered). 205 Hastings Street South, Hastings had been their physical address, until 26 Apr 2019. 100 shares are allocated to 4 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 25 shares (25 per cent of shares), namely:
William Sawers (a director) located at Havelock North, Havelock North postcode 4130. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25 per cent of all shares (25 shares); it includes
Philip Pinckney (a director) - located at Bluff Hill, Napier. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (25 shares, 25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Sharlene Bryant, located at Rd 4, Napier (a director). The Businesscheck information was last updated on 16 Jun 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
205 Hastings Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered | 26 Apr 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip Bernard William Pinckney
Bluff Hill, Napier, 4110
Address used since 05 Dec 2016 |
Director | 05 Dec 2016 - current |
Sharlene Maree Bryant
Rd 4, Napier, 4184
Address used since 05 Dec 2016 |
Director | 05 Dec 2016 - current |
Libby Ellen O'sullivan
Rd 12, Havelock North, 4294
Address used since 05 Dec 2016 |
Director | 05 Dec 2016 - current |
William David Sawers
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 05 Dec 2016 |
Director | 05 Dec 2016 - current |
Stuart Geoffrey Signal
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 05 Dec 2016 |
Director | 05 Dec 2016 - 20 Jan 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
205 Hastings Street South, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered | 05 Dec 2016 - 26 Apr 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
William David Sawers Director |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
05 Dec 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Philip Bernard William Pinckney Director |
Bluff Hill Napier 4110 |
05 Dec 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sharlene Maree Bryant Director |
Rd 4 Napier 4184 |
05 Dec 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Libby Ellen O'sullivan Director |
Rd 12 Havelock North 4294 |
05 Dec 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stuart Geoffrey Signal Individual |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
05 Dec 2016 - 01 Feb 2022 |
Rtl Consulting Limited 205 Hastings Street South |
|
Bruce Trustee Company Limited 205 Hastings Street South |
|
Bay Rheumatology Limited 205 Hastings Street |
|
Bate Hallett Trustees (no. 4) Limited 205 Hastings Street South |
|
W & D Woodward Family Trustee Company Limited 205 Hastings Street |
|
Jrmd Trustees (bg) Limited 205 Hastings Street South |