Ashhurst Agriculture Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429045876363) was started on 16 Dec 2016. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 306A Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4442 (type: other, records). 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Stevens, Andrew Derek (a director) located at Rd 10, Palmerston North postcode 4470. In the second group, a total of 2 shareholders hold 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Sarah Stevens (a director) - located at Rd 10, Palmerston North,
Stevens, Sarah Louise (an individual) - located at Rd 10, Palmerston North. "Beef cattle and sheep farming" (ANZSIC A014410) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Ashhurst Agriculture Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 14 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
38b Grove Road, Rd 10, Palmerston North, 4470 | Physical & service & registered | 16 Dec 2016 |
306a Broadway Avenue, Palmerston North, 4442 | Other (Address for Records) & records (Address for Records) | 15 Dec 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew Derek Stevens
Rd 10, Palmerston North, 4470
Address used since 16 Dec 2016 |
Director | 16 Dec 2016 - current |
Sarah Louise Stevens
Rd 10, Palmerston North, 4470
Address used since 16 Dec 2016 |
Director | 16 Dec 2016 - 13 Dec 2017 |
Mark Andrew Walker Clements
Rd 14, Ashhurst, 4884
Address used since 16 Dec 2016 |
Director | 16 Dec 2016 - 31 Mar 2017 |
Anna Clements
Rd 14, Ashhurst, 4884
Address used since 16 Dec 2016 |
Director | 16 Dec 2016 - 31 Mar 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stevens, Andrew Derek Director |
Rd 10 Palmerston North 4470 |
16 Dec 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sarah Louise Stevens Director |
Rd 10 Palmerston North 4470 |
16 Dec 2016 - current |
Stevens, Sarah Louise Individual |
Rd 10 Palmerston North 4470 |
16 Dec 2016 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Clements, Anna Individual |
Rd 14 Ashhurst 4884 |
16 Dec 2016 - 11 May 2017 |
Clements, Mark Andrew Walker Individual |
Rd 14 Ashhurst 4884 |
16 Dec 2016 - 11 May 2017 |
Anna Clements Director |
Rd 14 Ashhurst 4884 |
16 Dec 2016 - 11 May 2017 |
Mark Andrew Walker Clements Director |
Rd 14 Ashhurst 4884 |
16 Dec 2016 - 11 May 2017 |
The Herb Farm Limited Grove Road |
|
The Manawatu Canine Centre Incorporated 81 Grove Road |
|
Godfrey Securities Limited 1398 Colyton Road |
|
Sunworks NZ Limited 217 Oxford Street |
|
Lotz Of Potz Limited 138 Grove Road |
|
Asymaedit And Associates Limited 141 Harrisons Line |
Arnold Farming Limited 76 Fergusson Street |
Rawea Farms Limited 15 Oram Drive |
Duncrine Holdings Limited 269 Lethbridge Road |
Fairholm Farming Limited 139 Main Street |
Eastry Limited 143 Main Street |
Bellawood Limited 578 Mount Stewart Halcombe Road |