Ytoa Trustees Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429045910821) was registered on 16 Jan 2017. 3 addresses are in use by the company: Level One, 8 Porter Drive, Havelock North, 4157 (type: registered, physical). 65 Rangitikei Street, Palmerston North, Palmerston North had been their registered address, until 27 May 2019. Ytoa Trustees Limited used other aliases, namely: Dk Ytoa Trustees Limited from 16 Jan 2017 to 16 Jun 2021. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Waitoa, Josephine Mary (an individual) located at Rd 10, Havelock North postcode 4180. "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Ytoa Trustees Limited. Our database was last updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level One, Above Bnz Bank Building, Porter Drive, Havelock North, 4157 | Registered | 27 May 2019 |
Level One, Above Bnz Bank Building, Porter Drive, Havelock North, 4157 | Service & physical | 24 Jun 2021 |
Level One, 8 Porter Drive, Havelock North, 4157 | Registered | 19 Dec 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Josephine Mary Waitoa
Rd 10, Havelock North, 4180
Address used since 09 May 2019 |
Director | 09 May 2019 - current |
Kirsty Jane Kupa
Otane, Otane, 4202
Address used since 16 Jan 2017 |
Director | 16 Jan 2017 - 09 May 2019 |
Emma Elizabeth Dawson
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 16 Jan 2017 |
Director | 16 Jan 2017 - 07 Aug 2017 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
65 Rangitikei Street, Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4410 | Registered | 11 Dec 2017 - 27 May 2019 |
65 Rangitikei Street, Palmerston North, Palmerston North, 4410 | Physical | 11 Dec 2017 - 24 Jun 2021 |
201 Market Street, Hastings, Hastings, 4122 | Registered & physical | 16 Jan 2017 - 11 Dec 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Waitoa, Josephine Mary Individual |
Rd 10 Havelock North 4180 |
13 May 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fr Shareholding Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046469472 Company Number: 6559355 Entity |
01 Dec 2017 - 13 May 2019 | |
Dk Shareholding Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042234012 Company Number: 5911290 Entity |
Hastings 4122 |
16 Jan 2017 - 01 Dec 2017 |
Fr Shareholding Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046469472 Company Number: 6559355 Entity |
Palmerston North 4410 |
01 Dec 2017 - 13 May 2019 |
Dk Shareholding Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042234012 Company Number: 5911290 Entity |
16 Jan 2017 - 01 Dec 2017 |
Frsar Trustee Limited 65 Rangitikei Street |
|
Fr Trustee Company 16 Limited 65 Rangitikei Street |
|
Fr Kk Trustee Company Limited Level 8 |
|
Mckelvie Family Trustee Limited 65 Rangitikei Street |
|
Frmbr (cameron) Trustee Limited 65 Rangitikei Street |
|
Prbh Trustee Limited 65 Rangitikei Street |
Fr Kk Trustee Company Limited Level 8 |
Fr Trustee Company (hedley) Limited 65 Rangitikei Street |
Fr Trustee Company 14 Limited 65 Rangitikei Street |
Frbr Jones Trustee Limited 65 Rangitikei Street |
Michael Quin Trustee Limited 61-75 Rangitikei Street |
T & L Walton Trustee Limited Level 1, 165 Broadway Avenue |