Mitchell Mackersy Trustees (2017) Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429045914416) was registered on 25 Jan 2017. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 36 Grant Road, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 (type: registered, physical). 2 Clark Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin had been their registered address, up until 14 Jul 2021. 60 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 60 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Duncan Cotterill No 1 Limited (an entity) located at 148 Victoria Street, Christchurch postcode 8013. "Legal service" (ANZSIC M693130) is the classification the ABS issued to Mitchell Mackersy Trustees (2017) Limited. Our database was updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Po Box 2657, Wakatipu, Queenstown, 9349 | Postal | 06 Jul 2021 |
36 Grant Road, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 | Office & delivery | 06 Jul 2021 |
36 Grant Road, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical & service | 14 Jul 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Louise Melissa Mcnaughton
Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 01 Apr 2021 |
Director | 01 Apr 2021 - current |
Richard Vaughan Smith
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 01 Apr 2021 |
Director | 01 Apr 2021 - current |
Richard Stirling Thomson Lang
Clifton, Christchurch, 8081
Address used since 01 Apr 2021 |
Director | 01 Apr 2021 - current |
Alastair Ross Holland
Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302
Address used since 01 Apr 2021 |
Director | 01 Apr 2021 - current |
Adam Mcara Copland
Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 18 Feb 2020
Frankton, Queenstown, 9300
Address used since 25 Jan 2017 |
Director | 25 Jan 2017 - 01 Apr 2021 |
Hamish Selwyn Wilton
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 22 Sep 2020
Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302
Address used since 11 May 2017 |
Director | 11 May 2017 - 01 Apr 2021 |
Teresa Mary Wethey
Rd 1, Queenstown, 9371
Address used since 25 Jan 2017 |
Director | 25 Jan 2017 - 30 Jun 2020 |
Allan Ronald Mackersy
Arrowtown, Arrowtown, 9302
Address used since 25 Jan 2017 |
Director | 25 Jan 2017 - 30 Jun 2020 |
36 Grant Road , Frankton , Queenstown , 9300 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2 Clark Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 01 Jul 2020 - 14 Jul 2021 |
36 Grant Road, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical | 04 Dec 2019 - 01 Jul 2020 |
Unit 10, 34 Grant Road, Five Mile, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical | 05 Sep 2017 - 04 Dec 2019 |
First Floor, Aurum House, 1088 - 1092 Frankton Road,, Frankton, Queenstown, 9300 | Registered & physical | 25 Jan 2017 - 05 Sep 2017 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Duncan Cotterill No 1 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429039494832 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
148 Victoria Street Christchurch 8013 |
15 Apr 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wethey, Teresa Mary Individual |
Rd 1 Queenstown 9371 |
25 Jan 2017 - 15 Apr 2021 |
Copland, Adam Mcara Individual |
Frankton Queenstown 9300 |
25 Jan 2017 - 15 Apr 2021 |
Mackersy, Allan Ronald Individual |
Arrowtown Arrowtown 9302 |
25 Jan 2017 - 15 Apr 2021 |
Mellifera Honey Limited 57 Frankton-ladies Mile Highway |
|
City Impact Church Queenstown Education Limited 3 Hansen Road |
|
City Impact Queenstown Enterprises Limited 3 Hansen Road |
|
Wakatipu Netball Centre Incorporated Joe O'connell Drive |
|
Southern Public Relations Limited Level One, 1085 Frankton Road |
|
Hutton Salmon Limited Level 3, 26 Hawthorne Drive |
Macalister Todd Phillips Limited 3rd Floor, 11-17 Church Street |
Mawhinney & Co Limited Level 2 Bradleys Building |
Aspiring Law Limited 62 Ardmore Street |
Ardmore Trustee No 2 Limited 62 Ardmore Street |
Checketts Mckay Law Limited 21 Brandon Street |
Simpson Trustees (2017) Limited Level 1 |