Tim Byrne Trustee Company Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429045920417) was started on 20 Jan 2017. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 51 Ann Street, Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 (type: registered, service). 10 The Octagon, Dunedin Central, Dunedin had been their registered address, until 17 Mar 2021. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Cumming, Shona Kay (a director) located at Roslyn, Dunedin postcode 9010. The Businesscheck information was updated on 24 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
250 South Road, Caversham, Dunedin, 9012 | Physical & registered & service | 17 Mar 2021 |
51 Ann Street, Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010 | Registered & service | 06 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Shona Kay Cumming
Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010
Address used since 28 Oct 2023
Caversham, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 08 Feb 2022
Belleknowes, Dunedin, 9011
Address used since 20 Jan 2017 |
Director | 20 Jan 2017 - current |
Geoffrey Mirkin
Roslyn, Dunedin, 9010
Address used since 20 Jan 2017 |
Director | 20 Jan 2017 - 12 Feb 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
10 The Octagon, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 20 Feb 2018 - 17 Mar 2021 |
169 Princes Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & registered | 20 Jan 2017 - 20 Feb 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cumming, Shona Kay Director |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 |
20 Jan 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mirkin, Geoffrey Individual |
Roslyn Dunedin 9010 |
20 Jan 2017 - 09 Mar 2021 |
Bruhns Trustee 2012 Limited 10 The Octagon |
|
Darron Mitchell Limited 8 The Octagon |
|
Lucas And Lucas Limited Level 4, Moran Building |
|
Trustee Custodians Limited Level 4, Moran Building |
|
Mann Family Trusts Limited Level 4 Moran Building |
|
Outreach Software Limited Level 3 |