Bm Trustees Pft Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429046085603) was registered on 19 Apr 2017. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 5 Havelock Road, Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 (type: registered, physical). Cnr Eastbourne and Market Streets, Hastings had been their physical address, up to 03 Jan 2018. 120 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 60 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Chrystall, Nicholas Roger (a director) located at Havelock North, Havelock North postcode 4130. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 60 shares); it includes
Mossman, Tony David (a director) - located at Havelock North, Havelock North. "Trustee service" (business classification K641965) is the category the ABS issued Bm Trustees Pft Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
5 Havelock Road, Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130 | Registered & physical & service | 03 Jan 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicholas Roger Chrystall
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 23 Aug 2024
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 27 Oct 2022
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 25 Mar 2020
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 25 Mar 2020
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 19 Apr 2017 |
Director | 19 Apr 2017 - current |
Tony David Mossman
Havelock North, Havelock North, 4130
Address used since 19 Apr 2017 |
Director | 19 Apr 2017 - current |
Donna Diane Drake
Frimley, Hastings, 4120
Address used since 19 Apr 2017 |
Director | 19 Apr 2017 - current |
Tracey Anne Pollock
Mahora, Hastings, 4120
Address used since 19 Apr 2017 |
Director | 19 Apr 2017 - 21 Sep 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Cnr Eastbourne And Market Streets, Hastings, 4122 | Physical & registered | 19 Apr 2017 - 03 Jan 2018 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Chrystall, Nicholas Roger Director |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
19 Apr 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mossman, Tony David Director |
Havelock North Havelock North 4130 |
19 Apr 2017 - current |
Mapua Coastal Village Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Bruce Investments Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
On Trak Trustee Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Dames Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Newtons Flat Limited 5 Havelock Road |
|
Wg & Je Chambers Limited 5 Havelock Road |
On Trak Trustee Limited 5 Havelock Road |
Eastbourne Trustees No 7 Limited 5 Havelock Road |
Eastbourne Trustees Ksft Limited 5 Havelock Road |
Bm Trustees Hht Limited 5 Havelock Road |
Bm Trustees Bst Limited 5 Havelock Road |
Bm Trustees Tvt Limited 5 Havelock Road |