Nemausus Limited (NZBN 9429046099884) was incorporated on 28 Apr 2017. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 12 Gregory Street, Naenae, Lower Hutt, 5011 (type: registered, physical). 69 Rutherford Street, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt had been their registered address, up until 27 Apr 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 6 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 10 shares (10 per cent of shares), namely:
Petit, Caroline Benedicte (an individual) located at Eastbourne, Lower Hutt postcode 5013,
Independent Trust Company (2021) Limited (an entity) located at Lower Hutt postcode 5010,
Marquet, Sebastien Francois Jean-Yves (an individual) located at Eastbourne, Lower Hutt postcode 5013. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 90 per cent of all shares (90 shares); it includes
Independent Trust Company (2021) Limited (an entity) - located at Lower Hutt,
Drury, Caroline Rose (an individual) - located at Days Bay, Lower Hutt,
Petit, Benoit Pierre (a director) - located at Days Bay, Lower Hutt. "Investment - residential property" (business classification L671150) is the classification the ABS issued Nemausus Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 29 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
12 Gregory Street, Naenae, Lower Hutt, 5011 | Postal & office & delivery | 06 Apr 2022 |
12 Gregory Street, Naenae, Lower Hutt, 5011 | Physical & service | 14 Apr 2022 |
12 Gregory Street, Naenae, Lower Hutt, 5011 | Registered | 27 Apr 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Benoit Pierre Petit
Days Bay, Lower Hutt, 5013
Address used since 28 Apr 2017 |
Director | 28 Apr 2017 - current |
12 Gregory Street , Naenae , Lower Hutt , 5011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
69 Rutherford Street, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered | 25 May 2021 - 27 Apr 2022 |
69 Rutherford Street, Hutt Central, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Physical | 25 May 2021 - 14 Apr 2022 |
138 Hutt Park Road, Gracefield, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Physical & registered | 28 Apr 2017 - 25 May 2021 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Petit, Caroline Benedicte Individual |
Eastbourne Lower Hutt 5013 |
28 Apr 2017 - current |
Independent Trust Company (2021) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048929202 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Lower Hutt 5010 |
19 Apr 2021 - current |
Marquet, Sebastien Francois Jean-yves Individual |
Eastbourne Lower Hutt 5013 |
19 Apr 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Independent Trust Company (2021) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048929202 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Lower Hutt 5010 |
19 Apr 2021 - current |
Drury, Caroline Rose Individual |
Days Bay Lower Hutt 5013 |
19 Apr 2021 - current |
Petit, Benoit Pierre Director |
Days Bay Lower Hutt 5013 |
28 Apr 2017 - current |
Label & Litho Limited 151 Hutt Park Road |
|
Masterpet Corporation Limited 143 Hutt Park Road |
|
Lincoln Sentry Limited 150 Hutt Park Road |
|
Concrete Plus Limited 150 Hutt Park Road |
|
B&d Doors (nz) Limited 150 Hutt Park Road |
|
Alesco New Zealand Limited 150 Hutt Park Road |
Chatterbox Investments Limited Unit 2, 141hutt Park Road |
Kakariki Ip Limited 6-8 Meachen St, Seaview |
October Holdings Limited 56 Cheviot Road |
In Uniform New Zealand Limited 2 Moana Grove |
Witsend Limited 20 Cheviot Rd |
Jason Investments Limited 1 Cambridge Terrace |